This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2016 at 21:52:58 (UTC).

AFSANEH PAKIZEGEE VS. GARO KASSABIAN, M.D. ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 02/09/2012 AFSANEH PAKIZEGEE filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against GARO KASSABIAN, M D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AMY D. HOGUE, ELIA WEINBACH, DANIEL J. BUCKLEY and CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5917

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AMY D. HOGUE

ELIA WEINBACH

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAKIZEGEEM AFSANEH

Defendants

KASSABIAN M.D. GARO

LIFT MD AESTHETICS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JALILVAND KAMELIA

Defendant Attorneys

BONNE BRIDGES MUELLER O'KEEFE & NICHOL

ROLLER AMBER L.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RULING RE: PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND

5/30/2013: NOTICE OF RULING RE: PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GARO KASSABIAN, MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

6/17/2013: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GARO KASSABIAN, MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-PLAINTIFFS GARO KASSABIAN, M.D. AND LIFT MD AESTHETICS, INC.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

6/17/2013: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-PLAINTIFFS GARO KASSABIAN, M.D. AND LIFT MD AESTHETICS, INC.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

6/17/2013: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

CROSS-PLAINTIFFS GARO KASSABIAN, M.D. AND LIFT MD AESTHETICS, INC.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

6/17/2013: CROSS-PLAINTIFFS GARO KASSABIAN, M.D. AND LIFT MD AESTHETICS, INC.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFENDANTS GARO KASSABIAN, M.D.?S DBA LIFT MD AESTHETICS, INC.?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT THEREOF; EXHIBITS

6/17/2013: DEFENDANTS GARO KASSABIAN, M.D.?S DBA LIFT MD AESTHETICS, INC.?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT THEREOF; EXHIBITS

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF GARO KASSABIAN, M.D.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

6/17/2013: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF GARO KASSABIAN, M.D.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFENDANT GARO KASSABIAN, M.D. DBA LIFE MD AESTHETICS, INC.?S NOTICE OF LODGING DOCUMENTS AND RECORDS

6/17/2013: DEFENDANT GARO KASSABIAN, M.D. DBA LIFE MD AESTHETICS, INC.?S NOTICE OF LODGING DOCUMENTS AND RECORDS

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS OF DEFENDANTS, GARO KASSABIAN, M.D., CHERIN BANA AND JOHN BANA OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARAT

7/22/2013: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS OF DEFENDANTS, GARO KASSABIAN, M.D., CHERIN BANA AND JOHN BANA OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARAT

Minute Order

7/22/2013: Minute Order

OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS GARO KASSABIAN, M.D. AND LIFT MD AESTHETICS TO PLAINTIFF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITIONS OF GARO KASSABIAN, JOHN BANA, AND CHERIN BANA

7/22/2013: OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS GARO KASSABIAN, M.D. AND LIFT MD AESTHETICS TO PLAINTIFF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITIONS OF GARO KASSABIAN, JOHN BANA, AND CHERIN BANA

PLAINTIFF AFSANEH PAKIZEGEE?S OPPOSITION TO SEPARATE STATEMENT RE: MATERIAL DISPUTED FACTS AND EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANTS/CROSS COMPLAINANTS

8/22/2013: PLAINTIFF AFSANEH PAKIZEGEE?S OPPOSITION TO SEPARATE STATEMENT RE: MATERIAL DISPUTED FACTS AND EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANTS/CROSS COMPLAINANTS

CROSS DEFENDANT AFSANEH PAKIZEGEE?S OPPPOSITION TO CROSS-PLAINTIFF GARO KASSABIAN, M.D. AND LIFT MD AESTHETICS, INC.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT;

8/22/2013: CROSS DEFENDANT AFSANEH PAKIZEGEE?S OPPPOSITION TO CROSS-PLAINTIFF GARO KASSABIAN, M.D. AND LIFT MD AESTHETICS, INC.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT;

PLAINTIFF?S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS GARO KASSA8IAN, M.D.?S DBA LIFT MD AESTHETICS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT;

8/22/2013: PLAINTIFF?S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS GARO KASSA8IAN, M.D.?S DBA LIFT MD AESTHETICS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT;

PLAINTIFF AFSANEH PAKIZEGEE?S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANTS/CROSS-PLAINTIFFS RELATING TO THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT;

8/22/2013: PLAINTIFF AFSANEH PAKIZEGEE?S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANTS/CROSS-PLAINTIFFS RELATING TO THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT;

PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS GARO KASSABIAN, M.D.?S DBA LIFT MD AESTHETICS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT THEREO

8/22/2013: PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS GARO KASSABIAN, M.D.?S DBA LIFT MD AESTHETICS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT THEREO

PLAINTIFF AFSANEH PAKIZEGEE?S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANTS/CROSS COMPLAINANTS RELATING TO THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

8/22/2013: PLAINTIFF AFSANEH PAKIZEGEE?S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANTS/CROSS COMPLAINANTS RELATING TO THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

NOTICE OF ERRATA TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS GARO KASSAB1AN, M.D.?S DBA LIFT MI) AESTHETICS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS ANI) AUTHORITIES; DECLARAT

8/27/2013: NOTICE OF ERRATA TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS GARO KASSAB1AN, M.D.?S DBA LIFT MI) AESTHETICS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS ANI) AUTHORITIES; DECLARAT

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2014
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY GARO KASSABIAN, M.D. & LIFT MD AESTHETI ON 11/13/12 ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COM- PLAINT, WITH PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • DocketDeclaration (In Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • DocketMotion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Subject Person

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • DocketNotice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2013
  • DocketEx-Parte Application (TO CONT TRIAL DATES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2013
  • DocketOpposition ((FILED BY KASSABIAN & LIFT M.D.) TO EX-PARTE APPL TO CONT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • DocketProof of Service Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • DocketBrief (in reply to pltff's oppostion to defts' motion in limine no. 3,4,5,6.8. (filed this date separately) ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • DocketJury Instructions (joint ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2012
  • DocketMotion to Strike (PORTIONS OF PLFF'S 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • DocketStatement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • DocketNotice (OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND MOTION TO STRIKE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • DocketStatement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • DocketStatement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • DocketMotion to Strike (PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Demurrer (TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Com Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

Kamelia Jalilvand SBN 256065 | hfi@;&fi ‘

JALILVAND LAW CORPORATION o CREREE

5 1| 8383 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1022 Beverly Hills, CA 90211

3 || Telephone: (310) 478-5800 JUi v

. . . ! ".‘. wauzco . Facsimile: (310) 388-5538 BY L. JOH;;EWI DEPUTY

5 || Attorney for Plaintiff AFSANEH PAKIZEGEE

6 SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES CENTRAL DISTRICT

9 o || AFSANEH PAKIZEGEE, Case No.: SC115917 | [Assigned for All Purposes to Amy D. Hogue: 11 Plaintiffs, Dept 92]

NOTICE OF ERRATA TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS GARO

KASSABIAN, M.D.’S dba LIFT MD

AESTHETICS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY

JUDGMENT ON CROSS-COMPLAINT;

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND

AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT THEREOF; EXHIBITS

GARO KASSABIAN, M.D., LIFTMD 14 || AESTHETICS, Inc. ; and DOES 1 through 100, inclusive,

16 Detfendants.

17 || GARO KASSABIAN, M.D., INC. doing business as LIFT MD AESTHETICS, INC

Date: September 5, 2013 19 Cross-Complainant Time: 1:30 p.m. Vs. Dept: 92

20 || AFSANEH PAKIZEGEE,

Cross-Defendant Action Filed: February 9, 2012

Trail Date: October 15, 2013

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amber L Roller