This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/30/2020 at 09:12:16 (UTC).

AESTHETIC MAINTENANCE CORPORATION VS ACCI CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/10/2008 AESTHETIC MAINTENANCE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ACCI CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOANNE O'DONNELL and ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7900

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOANNE O'DONNELL

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AESTHETIC MAINTENANCE CORPORATION

Defendants

ACCI CORPORATION

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

PULTE HOME CORPORATION

Not Classified By Court

MULHOLLAND JAMES S. ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RYAN GREGORY R. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

KOELLER KEITH D. ESQ.

CASTLE NOMI L. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2009
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 48; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2009
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 48; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2009
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department Legacy; (Closed-ADR; Not held-Rmvd ADR-Settled prior) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2009
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Mediator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2009
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AGREEMENT OR NONAGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 48; Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT ORDER VACATING TRIAL AND RELATED HEARINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Aesthetic Maintenance Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2009
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 48; Court Order - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2009
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2008
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2008
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2008
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDING ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2008
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Aesthetic Maintenance Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2008
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2008
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2008
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2008
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Aesthetic Maintenance Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2008
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2008
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AESTHETIC MAINTENANCE CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where ACCI INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Pulte Home Company, LLC, successor by conversion of Pulte Home Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOELLER, KEITH D