This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2015 at 00:17:38 (UTC).

AES REDONDO BEACH LLC VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/30/2008 AES REDONDO BEACH LLC filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES C. CHALFANT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8450

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAMES C. CHALFANT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AES REDONDO BEACH LLC

Defendants

DOE DEFENDANTS 1 THROUGH 100

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

SALADINO MARK

WATANABE WENDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NORWOOD WADE E.

Defendant Attorney

TYRELL THOMAS M. DEPUTY COUNTY COUNSEL

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/4/2009: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

8/4/2009: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL

5/20/2009: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL

Minute Order

4/9/2009: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

4/6/2009: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND WRIT OF MANDATE

3/16/2009: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND WRIT OF MANDATE

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND WRIT OF MANDATE

3/16/2009: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND WRIT OF MANDATE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

2/20/2009: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

2/20/2009: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

2/20/2009: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

1/5/2009: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF, AND ETC.

12/30/2008: VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF, AND ETC.

SUMMONS

12/30/2008: SUMMONS

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2009
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PETITION ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2009
  • Notice-Change of Address Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2009
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2009
  • Answer Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2009
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2009
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2008
  • Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AES REDONDO BEACH L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF is a litigant