This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/09/2015 at 02:12:33 (UTC).

AES REDONDO BEACH LLC ET LA VS ELEANOR MANZANO ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/27/2009 AES REDONDO BEACH LLC ET LA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ELEANOR MANZANO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JAMES C. CHALFANT, DAVID YAFFE and ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2415

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JAMES C. CHALFANT

DAVID YAFFE

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AES REDONDO BEACH LLC

CURRIE ROBERT

FALK LISA R.

NEVAREZ ROBERT

SULLIVAN KEVIN

Defendants

ASPEL STEVE

AUST PAT

BRAND BILL

CAGLE CHRIS

DIELS STEVEN

EMDEE LAURA

GIN MICHAEL

KILROY MATTHEW

MANZANO ELEANOR

MARCHESE SANDY

REDONDO BEACH CITY COUNCIL

REDONDO BEACH CITY OF THE

WEBB MICHAEL W.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHMOND RICK ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

FOX DEBORAH J. ESQ.

SCHMALZ KURT L. ESQ.

WEBB MICHAEL W. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICLE OF RELATED CASE

8/27/2009: NOTICLE OF RELATED CASE

PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

8/27/2009: PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

AMENDED VERIFED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

9/1/2009: AMENDED VERIFED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE

9/1/2009: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE

Proof of Service

9/1/2009: Proof of Service

DECLARATION OF RICK RICHMOND IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND MOTION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE OR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

9/2/2009: DECLARATION OF RICK RICHMOND IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND MOTION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE OR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

COMPENDIUM OF NON-CALIFORNIA AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND MOTION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE OR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

9/2/2009: COMPENDIUM OF NON-CALIFORNIA AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND MOTION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE OR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER (1) SCHEDULING HEARING ON PETITIONERS MOTION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE OR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE, AND (2) AUTHORIZING CERTAIN EXPEDITED DISCOVERY, ETC

9/2/2009: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER (1) SCHEDULING HEARING ON PETITIONERS MOTION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE OR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE, AND (2) AUTHORIZING CERTAIN EXPEDITED DISCOVERY, ETC

Minute Order

9/2/2009: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/2/2009: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE

9/2/2009: PROOF OF SERVICE

Proof of Service

9/4/2009: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

9/4/2009: Proof of Service

RESPONDENTS AND REAL PARTIES EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO EXHIBITS TO AMEND VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

9/4/2009: RESPONDENTS AND REAL PARTIES EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO EXHIBITS TO AMEND VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

EX PARTE APPLICATION NO. 1, ETC.

9/4/2009: EX PARTE APPLICATION NO. 1, ETC.

EX PARTE APPLICATION NO. 2, ETC.

9/4/2009: EX PARTE APPLICATION NO. 2, ETC.

EX PARTE APPLICATION NO. 3, ETC.

9/4/2009: EX PARTE APPLICATION NO. 3, ETC.

EX PARTE APPLICATION NO. 4

9/4/2009: EX PARTE APPLICATION NO. 4

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2010
  • Notice (of entry of order granting motion ) Filed by Attorney for Real Pty in Interest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2010
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Real Pty in Interest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2009
  • Reply/Response Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2009
  • Reply/Response (in support of motion ) Filed by Attorney for Real Pty in Interest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2009
  • Opposition Document Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2009
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2009
  • Declaration (RICK RICHMOND ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2009
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2009
  • Notice of Continuance Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2009
  • Opposition Document (to motion to strike ) Filed by Attorney for Real Pty in Interest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 09/04/2009
  • Points and Authorities Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2009
  • Ex-Parte Application (for ord to schedule hrg on petnrs mo for writ of mandate ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2009
  • Miscellaneous-Other (compendium of non-california authorities ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2009
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2009
  • Declaration (of rick richmond ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2009
  • Amended Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2009
  • Amended Petition Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2009
  • Notice-Related Cases (W/ BS107863 ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2009
  • Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/1990
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AES REDONDO BEACH L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where REDONDO BEACH CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Walter Webb

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Deborah J. Fox