This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/29/2016 at 18:15:02 (UTC).

ADVANCED AIR LLC ET AL VS UNDERTOW FILMS LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/14/2014 ADVANCED AIR LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against UNDERTOW FILMS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD FRUIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1637

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ADVANCED AIR

ADVANCED AIR AIRCRAFT SERVICES LLC

ADVANCED AIR LLC

DISCOVERY CHANNEL

HAWTHORNE AIRPORT LLC

JET CENTER LOS ANGELES

Defendants and Respondents

DISCOVERY COMMUNICATIONS LLC

DOES 1-100

KENNEDY MIKE

UNDERTOW FILMS LLC

VERDI-ROSSE CLENET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DINSMORE & SANDELMANN LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

SAGER KELLI L. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. TRESPASS TO REAL PROPERTY; ETC

7/14/2014: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. TRESPASS TO REAL PROPERTY; ETC

SUMMONS

7/14/2014: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/5/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/5/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS? INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 15 DAYS? [CAL. R. CT. 3J10(D)

8/18/2014: STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS? INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 15 DAYS? [CAL. R. CT. 3J10(D)

Minute Order

9/4/2014: Minute Order

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FURTHER EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS? INITIAL COMPLAINT

9/4/2014: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FURTHER EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS? INITIAL COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/23/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

10/1/2014: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2014
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (W/P ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • Stipulation and Order (TO FUTHER EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF INITIAL COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • Stipulation Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Advanced Air, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hawthorne Airport, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DISCOVERY COMMUNICATIONS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAGER KELLI LEE