Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2019 at 08:05:37 (UTC).

ADRIENNE MCCOLL VS CABRILLO MARINE AQUARIUM ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/11/2016 ADRIENNE MCCOLL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CABRILLO MARINE AQUARIUM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0002

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

MCCOLL ADRIENNE

MCCOL ADRIENNE

Defendants and Respondents

CITY OF LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

CABRILLO MARINE AQUARIUM

WEBBER CORA

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

DOES 1-60

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

CITY OF LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT

MORRIS POLICH & PURDY NICOLE HERMANSON

CORA WEBBER AN

AQUARIUM CABRILLO MARINE

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

TAYLOR & RING LLP

TAYLOR & RING

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

JANNOL HENRY N. ESQ.

FEUER MICHAEL N. CITY ATTORNEY

ASIANO ANN

BENJAMIN CHAPMAN DEPUTY CITY ATTORNEY

LAW OFFICES OF HENRY N. JANNOL

ASIANO ANN M.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEAL

12/14/2017: NOTICE OF APPEAL

NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED JURISDICTION)

12/18/2017: NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED JURISDICTION)

APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL

1/4/2018: APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL

NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL)

2/8/2018: NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL)

SUMMONS

2/11/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND DAMAGES ARISING FROM CHILDHOOD SEXUAL ABUSE (DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL)

2/11/2016: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND DAMAGES ARISING FROM CHILDHOOD SEXUAL ABUSE (DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL)

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

3/17/2016: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

DEFENDANT CORA WEBBER'S MOTION FOR ORDER STAYING ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF PAUL H. LEVINE

3/28/2016: DEFENDANT CORA WEBBER'S MOTION FOR ORDER STAYING ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF PAUL H. LEVINE

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF PAUL H. LEVINE

4/13/2016: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF PAUL H. LEVINE

Minute Order

4/13/2016: Minute Order

Unknown

4/14/2016: Unknown

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

4/18/2016: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CORAL WEBBER'S MOTION FOR ORDER STAYING ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF BRENDAN P. GILBERT

5/11/2016: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CORAL WEBBER'S MOTION FOR ORDER STAYING ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF BRENDAN P. GILBERT

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT CORA WEBBER'S MOTION FOR ORDER STAYING ACTION

5/16/2016: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT CORA WEBBER'S MOTION FOR ORDER STAYING ACTION

DEFENDANT CORA WEBBER'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER STAYING ACTION

6/14/2016: DEFENDANT CORA WEBBER'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER STAYING ACTION

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

6/14/2016: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Minute Order

6/22/2016: Minute Order

ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

6/22/2016: ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2018
  • Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Notice of Appeal; Filed by Adrienne McColl (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Notice of Appeal; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Ntc to Atty re Notice of Appeal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED JURISDICTION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Notice of Appeal; Filed by Adrienne McColl (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
137 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Adrienne McColl (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons (PARTY SERVED: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by ADRIENNE MCCOL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by ADRIENNE MCCOL (Plaintiff); Adrienne McColl (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by ADRIENNE MCCOL (Plaintiff); Adrienne McColl (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND DAMAGES ARISING FROM CHILDHOOD SEXUAL ABUSE (DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC610002    Hearing Date: October 27, 2020    Dept: S27

Defendant, Cora Webber seeks an order consolidating BC610002 with 19STCV16068. Defendant contends the two cases arise out of the same or similar incidents and involve overlapping parties, such that they should be consolidated.

The motion is denied without prejudice. The cases have not yet been deemed related, and 19STCV16068 is pending in Department 28 of the Spring Street Courthouse. Pursuant to Local Rule 3.3(g)(1), which requires cases to be pending in the same department before being consolidated, the motion is denied.

Moving Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at gdcdepts27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If any party does not submit on the tentative, the party should make arrangements to appear remotely at the hearing on this matter.

Case Number: BC610002    Hearing Date: August 20, 2020    Dept: S27

Plaintiff, Adrienne McColl filed this action against Defendants, Cabrillo Marine Aquarium, City of Los Angeles Department of Recreation and Parks, City of Los Angeles, County of Los Angeles, and Cora Webber for damages arising out of sexual abuse Plaintiff sustained at the hands of Webber while she, as a minor, worked at the aquarium. As against the aquarium and the city, the complaint includes causes of action for:

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLARK HILL PLC FKA MORRIS PLICH & PURDY LLP is a litigant