This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/31/2016 at 03:16:01 (UTC).

ADRIANA SALAS VS GATEWAY PLAZA ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/11/2014 ADRIANA SALAS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GATEWAY PLAZA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4407

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SALAS ADRIANA

Defendants and Respondents

9430-9532 EAST WHITTIER BOULEVARD HOLD-

COMMON AREA MAINTENANCE SERVICES INC.

CW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

DOES 1-100

GATEWAY PICO RIVERA LP.

GATEWAY PLAZA

SAFCO CAPITAL CORPORATION

SEPULVEDA CAPITAL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF GERALD L. MARCUS

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

FERRERI CHRISTINA L. ESQ.

KALFA ESQ. LEDA

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

8/11/2014: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

8/11/2014: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/14/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/14/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/14/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/14/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Unknown

12/15/2014: Unknown

REQUEST FOR STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

12/15/2014: REQUEST FOR STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

DEMAND FOR JUEY TRIAL

12/15/2014: DEMAND FOR JUEY TRIAL

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

12/15/2014: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/29/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Unknown

1/8/2015: Unknown

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

1/8/2015: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

3/10/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/7/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2015
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (With prejudice; Entire action of all parties and all causes of action ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • OSC-DISMISSAL (Notice of Settlmnt) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (AS TO DEFENDANTS, GATEWAY PICO RIVERA, LP; SAFCO CAPITAL CORPORAT AND SEPULVEDA CAPITAL, LLC, ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • Answer Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • Answer Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • Miscellaneous-Other (REQUEST FOR STATEMENT OF DAMAGES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2014
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GATEWAY PICO RIVERA LP. is a litigant

Latest cases where SAFCO CAPITAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMON AREA MAINTENANCE SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERRERI CHRISTINA L. ESQ.