This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/13/2018 at 20:20:46 (UTC).

ADRIA AUGMON VS MOLLY'S FROZEN TREATS #43352 LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/08/2016 ADRIA AUGMON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against MOLLY'S FROZEN TREATS 43352 LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERESA SANCHEZ-GORDON and TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6296

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

TERESA SANCHEZ-GORDON

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

AUGMON ADRIA

Defendants and Respondents

MOLLY'S FROZEN TREATS #43352 LLC

INTERNATIONAL DAIRY QUEEN INC.

LAYMAN MARY

DOES 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ABRAMSON LABOR GROUP

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

HILL BENJAMIN ESQ.

FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP

MOORE BONITA D.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

4/8/2016: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE

6/3/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE

DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL DAIRY QUEEN INCA'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

6/17/2016: DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL DAIRY QUEEN INCA'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., ? 170.6)

6/22/2016: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., ? 170.6)

APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADMITTING KERRY BUNDY AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE; ETC.

7/5/2016: APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADMITTING KERRY BUNDY AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE; ETC.

Minute Order

7/5/2016: Minute Order

APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADMITTING NICK ROTCHADL AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE; ETC.

7/5/2016: APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADMITTING NICK ROTCHADL AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE; ETC.

CROSS-DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT BY CROSS-COMPLAINANT MARY LAYMAN

7/13/2016: CROSS-DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT BY CROSS-COMPLAINANT MARY LAYMAN

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/29/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/29/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/29/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER RE: A. NICK ROTCHADL'S APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE B. KERRY BUNDY'S APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE

8/10/2016: ORDER RE: A. NICK ROTCHADL'S APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE B. KERRY BUNDY'S APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

8/30/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order

2/17/2017: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF NICK ROTCHADL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES

2/17/2017: DECLARATION OF NICK ROTCHADL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES

DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN HILL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES

2/17/2017: DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN HILL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES

MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES

2/17/2017: MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES

DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES

2/17/2017: DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Court Order - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Notice of Change of Address; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Conference-Post Mediation Status - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Order (RE EPA TO CONT TRIAL ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Memorandum - Other (IN SUPPORT OF EPA ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Declaration (1) BENJAMIN HILL 2) NICK ROTCHADL ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Ex-Parte Application (RE CONT TRIAL ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • at 08:30 am in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Trial Date Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • Notice (intent to appear by court call ); Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2016
  • Application-Miscellaneous ((2) SEP. APPL.FOR AN ORDER ADMITTING KERRY BUNDY AND NICK ROTCHADL AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Answer to Unverified Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • Answer to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • Cross-complaint; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons (BY FAX ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons (FILED BY FAX ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less