This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 05:47:46 (UTC).

ADONIS KISH VS ANTIAGING INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/12/2015 ADONIS KISH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ANTIAGING INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD E. RICO and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5478

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RICHARD E. RICO

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

KISH ADONIS

INTERMEDIC INC.

NAZARI MOJDEG AMINI

KHOIE MOHAMAD HADI SHARIFZADEH

UNIQ PHARMA

VIVA PHARMACEUTICAL INC.

MIRFAKHRAIE JAMAL

PHARMA UNIQ

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ANTIAGING INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA INC.

DOES 1 TO 100

ERSHADI SHOREH

ERSHADI SHOHREH

KHOIE HADI

DR. SHOHREH ERSHADI

ERSHADI DR. SHOHREH

Defendants and Respondents

KHOIE HADI

DR. SHOHREH ERSHADI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

KHALILPOUR LAW GROUP

BYRON Y. CHUNG APC

MAZYAR H. MAZAREI LAW OFFICS OF

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ADLI LAW GROUP PC

O'ROURKE FONG & MANOUKIAN LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

O'ROURKE FONG & MANOUKIAN LLP

Other Attorneys

BUTLER THOMAS SEAN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/15/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/7/2019: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

5/8/2015: DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/8/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND CROSS-COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF TE?AIRA LAW IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS/CROSS- COMPLAINANT?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SPECIALINTERROGATORIES, REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/10/2015: DECLARATION OF TE?AIRA LAW IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS/CROSS- COMPLAINANT?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SPECIALINTERROGATORIES, REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS/CROSS-COMPLAINTS MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFF ADONIS KISH'S SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BANK RECORDS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,000.00 AGAINST ANTIAGING INSTITU

11/17/2015: OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS/CROSS-COMPLAINTS MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFF ADONIS KISH'S SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BANK RECORDS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,000.00 AGAINST ANTIAGING INSTITU

DECLARATION OF BRYON Y. CHUNG, ESQ.

11/24/2015: DECLARATION OF BRYON Y. CHUNG, ESQ.

CROSS-DEFENDANTS' OBJECTION TO CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/22/2016: CROSS-DEFENDANTS' OBJECTION TO CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

Minute Order

4/27/2016: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS' SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: 1. CALIFORNIA UNFAIR COMPETITION; ETC.

5/18/2016: DEFENDANTS' SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: 1. CALIFORNIA UNFAIR COMPETITION; ETC.

CROSS-DEFENDANTS MOJDEH AMINI NAZARI AND INTERMEDIC INC'S NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER TO PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT ADONIS KISH AND CROSS-DEFENDANT KHOEI'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF O

8/1/2016: CROSS-DEFENDANTS MOJDEH AMINI NAZARI AND INTERMEDIC INC'S NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER TO PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT ADONIS KISH AND CROSS-DEFENDANT KHOEI'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF O

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE ETC.

8/15/2016: SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE ETC.

Minute Order

9/14/2016: Minute Order

DEFENDANT SHOREH ERSHADI'S RESPONSE TO MARINA MANOUKIAN'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

9/29/2016: DEFENDANT SHOREH ERSHADI'S RESPONSE TO MARINA MANOUKIAN'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

12/13/2016: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

ORDER ON OBJECTIONS AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DECLARATION OF MAHBOD MIKE KHALILPOUR

8/17/2017: ORDER ON OBJECTIONS AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DECLARATION OF MAHBOD MIKE KHALILPOUR

TENTATIVE RULING

8/17/2017: TENTATIVE RULING

JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL

9/8/2017: JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL

386 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • Objection (to Proposed Judgment and Request for Written Ruling on Causes of Action 2,3,4,5,6,7,8,9 and10); Filed by Antiaging Institute of California, Inc. (Legacy Party); Shohreh Ershadi (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Adonis Kish (Legacy Party); Mohamad Hadi Sharifzadeh Khoie (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Order (order ON TENTATIVE RULING); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Order (ORDER ON TENTATIVE RULING); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Order (ORDER ON TENTATIVE RULING); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Order (order on tentative ruling); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Reply ( to Opposition to Motion to Tax Costs for Memorandum of Costs of Adonis Kish); Filed by Antiaging Institute of California, Inc. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
723 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Adonis Kish (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (CCP 425.115)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Adonis Kish (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (CCP 425.115)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2013
  • Order; Filed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2013
  • Order; Filed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2012
  • Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by Adonis Kish (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Antiaging Institute of California, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUTLER THOMAS SEAN