This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/22/2021 at 01:51:34 (UTC).

ADELINO ACOSTA ET AL VS SHELL OIL COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/14/2009 ADELINO ACOSTA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SHELL OIL COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER, PETER D. LICHTMAN, ELIHU M. BERLE and JOSEPH E. DILORETO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3643

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

PETER D. LICHTMAN

ELIHU M. BERLE

JOSEPH E. DILORETO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NAVARRO RUDY

JESUS MACIAS-ZUNIGA

SOCORRO MADRIGAL

VICTOR VELAZCO

TIONGSON LINA

CHALED BEN

MICHAEL CUARESMA

FARIN ADELA

JAIME BAUTISTA

PATRICK PANTALEON

GILICERIA HINSHILWOOD

POST BARBARA

TORRES REGINA

JOSEPHINA LANDINGIN

ALVAREZ FRANCISCO

CHRISTINE C. FERNANDEZ

MARY ANN BANUELOS

CHRISTINA RODRIGUEZ

NAVAL RICHARD

Other

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

632 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHISVIN & ASSOCIATES

GIRARDI & KEESE LAW OFFICES OF

GIRARDI | KEESE

DION-KINDEM PETER R.

Other Attorneys

LESLIE MICHAEL ESQ.

AKIN GUMP STRAUSS HAUER & FELD LLP

WILLENKEN WILSON LOH & LIEB LLP

DOLL AMIR & ELEY LLP

VINSON & ELKINS LLP

MUNGER TOLLES & OLSON LLP

CALDWELL LESLIE & PROCTOR PC

MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

CALDWELL LESLIE PROCTOR PC

GIBSON DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP [N.Y.]

GIBSON DUNN & CRTCHER LLP [IRVINE]

GIBSON DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP [L.A.]

WILLENKEN & WILSON LOH & LIEB LLP

GIBSON DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP [IRVINE]

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

PC CALDWELL LESLIE PROCTOR

 

Court Documents

Status Report - JOINT FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

10/14/2016: Status Report - JOINT FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTES ENTERED 10/17/16 COUNTY CLERK

10/17/2016: Minute Order - MINUTES ENTERED 10/17/16 COUNTY CLERK

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

10/17/2016: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Brief - PLAINTIFFS OPPOSING BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO SHELL'S REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY IN CONNECTION WITH MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION

10/21/2016: Brief - PLAINTIFFS OPPOSING BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO SHELL'S REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY IN CONNECTION WITH MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION

Opposition - DEFENDANTS DOLE FOOD COMPANY, INC., BARCLAY HOLLANDER CORP AND OCEANIC PROP, INC.'S OPP TO SHELL OIL CO BRIEF IN SUP OF ITS DISCOVERY IN CONNECTION WITH MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT D

10/24/2016: Opposition - DEFENDANTS DOLE FOOD COMPANY, INC., BARCLAY HOLLANDER CORP AND OCEANIC PROP, INC.'S OPP TO SHELL OIL CO BRIEF IN SUP OF ITS DISCOVERY IN CONNECTION WITH MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT D

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEREMIAH P. WEBB IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO SHELL OIL COMPANY'S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS DISCOVERY IN CONNECTION WITH MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMIN

10/24/2016: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEREMIAH P. WEBB IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO SHELL OIL COMPANY'S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS DISCOVERY IN CONNECTION WITH MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMIN

Response - SHELL OIL COMPANY'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSING BRIEF REGARDING REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY IN CONNECTION WITH MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION

10/25/2016: Response - SHELL OIL COMPANY'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSING BRIEF REGARDING REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY IN CONNECTION WITH MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION

Status Report - JOINT FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

10/25/2016: Status Report - JOINT FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Minute Order -

10/26/2016: Minute Order -

Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account -

11/8/2016: Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account -

Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account -

11/8/2016: Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account -

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT W. FINNERTY REGARDING MINORS ACCOUNTS

11/8/2016: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT W. FINNERTY REGARDING MINORS ACCOUNTS

Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account -

11/8/2016: Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account -

Opposition - SHELL OIL COMPANY'S OPPOSITION TO DEVELOPER DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

11/15/2016: Opposition - SHELL OIL COMPANY'S OPPOSITION TO DEVELOPER DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEANNE L. MILLER IN SUPPORT OF SHELL OIL COMPANY'S OPPOSITION TO DEVELOPER DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

11/15/2016: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEANNE L. MILLER IN SUPPORT OF SHELL OIL COMPANY'S OPPOSITION TO DEVELOPER DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Minute Order -

11/18/2016: Minute Order -

Objection - SHELL OIL COMPANY'S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF DEVELOPER DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

11/22/2016: Objection - SHELL OIL COMPANY'S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF DEVELOPER DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULINGS MADE DURING NOVEMBER 28, 2016 HEARING

12/16/2016: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULINGS MADE DURING NOVEMBER 28, 2016 HEARING

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketCase File - Public

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 322; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketStipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketMinute Order -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Richard Fair (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 322; (Telephonic Conference; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 322; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Oceanic, Properties, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
1,729 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2009
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2009
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PARTY SERVED SHELL OIL COMPANY, CASTLE & COOKE CALIFORNIA, INC, OCEAN PROPERTIES, INC,BARCLAY HOLLANDER CORPORATION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2009
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by Adelino Acosta (Plaintiff); Estrellita Acosta (Plaintiff); Manuel Acosta (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2009
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (ROYAL DUTCH SHELL, INC. (DOE 1) ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2009
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Adelino Acosta (Plaintiff); Estrellita Acosta (Plaintiff); Manuel Acosta (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2009
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Adelino Acosta (Plaintiff); Estrellita Acosta (Plaintiff); Manuel Acosta (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2009
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Adelino Acosta (Plaintiff); Estrellita Acosta (Plaintiff); Manuel Acosta (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2009
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2009
  • DocketComplaint Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2009
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Adelino Acosta (Plaintiff); Estrellita Acosta (Plaintiff); Manuel Acosta (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LESLIE MICHAEL ESQ.