This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2019 at 00:16:59 (UTC).

ADAN CAMPOS VS CLUB POTRERO ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/23/2016 ADAN CAMPOS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CLUB POTRERO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3556

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CAMPOS ADAN

Defendants and Respondents

COSIO MANUEL

CLUB POTRERO

DOES 1 TO 100 INCLUSIVE

POTRERO INC. DBA POTRERO CLUB

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

POTRERO INC. DBA POTRERO CLUB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CASTILLO ANTONIO III ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Unknown

12/28/2017: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/5/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ORDER] AND SRIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL. FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

3/23/2018: ORDER] AND SRIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL. FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

9/28/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Unknown

12/12/2018: Unknown

Request for Dismissal

12/31/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

1/2/2019: Request for Dismissal

Complaint

12/23/2016: Complaint

CoverSheet

12/23/2016: CoverSheet

Summons

12/23/2016: Summons

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12/29/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/4/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

9/5/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

9/5/2017: STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/2/2017: SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. GENERAL NEGLIGENCE; 2. PREMISES LIABILITY

11/2/2017: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. GENERAL NEGLIGENCE; 2. PREMISES LIABILITY

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF POTRERO, INC. DBA POTRERO CLUB FOR: (1) EXPRESS INDEMNITY; (2) EQUITABLE INDEMNITY; ETC

12/18/2017: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF POTRERO, INC. DBA POTRERO CLUB FOR: (1) EXPRESS INDEMNITY; (2) EQUITABLE INDEMNITY; ETC

POTRERO, INC. DBA POTRERO CLUB ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/18/2017: POTRERO, INC. DBA POTRERO CLUB ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Adan Campos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Request for Dismissal (--With Prejudice--as to Cross-Complaint filed by Club Potero, Inc. dba Potrero Club on 12/18/2017); Filed by Adan Campos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 93; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Continued by Stipulation) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 93; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Continued by Stipulation) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2017
  • STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Adan Campos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Adan Campos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Adan Campos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less