This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2019 at 09:15:49 (UTC).

ADAM SHARP, ET AL VS. MARTIN RAMIREZ

Case Summary

On 08/28/2015 ADAM SHARP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MARTIN RAMIREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAMONA G. SEE and STUART M. RICE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0798

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAMONA G. SEE

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CADILLAC CITY INC.

SHARP ADAM

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

RAMIREZ MARTIN

TROCHE MARTIN RAMIREZ

RAMIREZ MARTIN AKA MARTIN RAMIREZ TROCHE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BLAKE & AYAZ

BLAKE RICK ARNOLD

Defendant Attorneys

NASATIR HIRSCH & PODBERESKY

MIHELL MONICA ARIEL

 

Court Documents

Summons

8/28/2015: Summons

Legacy Document

8/31/2015: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

9/8/2015: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

10/6/2015: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

10/16/2015: Legacy Document

Case Management Order

3/14/2016: Case Management Order

Legacy Document

10/3/2017: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

10/3/2017: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

10/16/2017: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

10/16/2017: Legacy Document

Notice of Lien

3/5/2018: Notice of Lien

Legacy Document

3/29/2018: Legacy Document

Minute Order

3/29/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/10/2018: Minute Order

Notice

8/11/2018: Notice

Minute Order

9/7/2018: Minute Order

Proof of Personal Service

4/9/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order

4/10/2019: Minute Order

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Adam Sharp (Plaintiff); Cadillac CIty, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Declaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Cadillac CIty, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • at 08:33 AM in Department M; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Notice (To Appear At Hearing And Produce Documents); Filed by Adam Sharp (Plaintiff); Cadillac CIty, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Application and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by Adam Sharp (Plaintiff); Cadillac CIty, Inc. (Plaintiff); Martin Ramirez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • at 08:33 AM in Department M; Hearing on Motion for Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; Hearing on Motion for Order (Motion for an Order; Denied without prejudice) -

    Read MoreRead Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2015
  • Minute order entered: 2015-08-31 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • Declaration; Filed by Adam Sharp (Plaintiff); Cadillac CIty, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • Declaration; Filed by Adam Sharp (Plaintiff); Cadillac CIty, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • Declaration; Filed by Adam Sharp (Plaintiff); Cadillac CIty, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by Adam Sharp (Plaintiff); Cadillac CIty, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • Minute Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Adam Sharp (Plaintiff); Cadillac CIty, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • Summons; Filed by Adam Sharp (Plaintiff); Cadillac CIty, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Adam Sharp (Plaintiff); Cadillac CIty, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Adam Sharp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.