Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2021 at 10:20:13 (UTC).

ADAM M KLOTZ ET AL VS STEPHEN A BRUCE ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/17/2012 ADAM M KLOTZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STEPHEN A BRUCE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOSH M. FREDRICKS, JOSEPH R. KALIN, JOHN P. FARRELL, CONRAD R. ARAGON and JOHN L. SEGAL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7629

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOSH M. FREDRICKS

JOSEPH R. KALIN

JOHN P. FARRELL

CONRAD R. ARAGON

JOHN L. SEGAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ADAM M. KLOTZ [BC517937]

KLOTZ ADAM M.

RICHARD A. SPITZ [BC517937]

SAGEMILL CAPITAL ADVISORS LLC

SAGEMILL CAPITAL ADVISORS LLP [BC517937]

SPITZ RICHARD A.

Defendants and Respondents

BRUCE STEPHEN A.

EZZES STEVEN

MILBANK TWEED HADLEY MCCLOY LLP- BC517937

STEPHEN A. BRUCE AND MONA BRUCE LIVING

SWANSON STEPHEN

Cross Defendants

FOX ROTHSCHILD

MICHAEL EIDEL

EIDEL MICHAEL

ROTHSCHILD FOX

Interested Party

STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP. [BC517937]

FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MUNGER TOLLES & OLSON LAW O/O

KEESAL SAMUEL A.

DEIXLER BERT H. ESQ.

CALDWELL LESLIE & PROCTOR PC [BC517937]

 

Court Documents

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER SPECIAL INTERROGATORY RESPONSES

6/11/2013: SEPARATE STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER SPECIAL INTERROGATORY RESPONSES

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; ETC

12/2/2013: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; ETC

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR AT DEPOSITION BY TELEPHONE

12/12/2013: NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR AT DEPOSITION BY TELEPHONE

DEFENDANTS MILBANK, TWEED HADLEY & MCCLO DEBORAH FESTA?S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLATHET OF SAGEMILL CAPITAL ADVISORS LLC

1/6/2014: DEFENDANTS MILBANK, TWEED HADLEY & MCCLO DEBORAH FESTA?S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLATHET OF SAGEMILL CAPITAL ADVISORS LLC

PLAINTEFFS? RESPONSE TO EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT STEVEN EZZES

1/16/2014: PLAINTEFFS? RESPONSE TO EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT STEVEN EZZES

APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

2/14/2014: APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT STEPHEN SWANSON?S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF ADAM M. KLOTZ

2/18/2014: SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT STEPHEN SWANSON?S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF ADAM M. KLOTZ

NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL PER CRC RULE 8.124

3/11/2014: NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL PER CRC RULE 8.124

Minute Order -

3/25/2014: Minute Order -

DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF ADAM M. KLOTZ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO DEPOSITION QUESTIONS POSED TO DEFENDANT DEBORAH FESTA

11/10/2014: DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF ADAM M. KLOTZ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO DEPOSITION QUESTIONS POSED TO DEFENDANT DEBORAH FESTA

PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT DEBORAH FESTA

11/10/2014: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT DEBORAH FESTA

PROOF OF SERVICE

12/16/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION 1. FOR LEAVE TO FILE SURREPLY IN FURTHER OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BRUCE'S MOTION TO COMPEL, ETC

12/31/2014: NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION 1. FOR LEAVE TO FILE SURREPLY IN FURTHER OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BRUCE'S MOTION TO COMPEL, ETC

FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT AND THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT OF STEPHEN A. BRUCE AND STEPHEN A. BRUCE AND MONA BRUCE LIVING TRUST

1/8/2015: FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT AND THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT OF STEPHEN A. BRUCE AND STEPHEN A. BRUCE AND MONA BRUCE LIVING TRUST

DEFENDANTS STEPHEN A. BRUCE AND STEPHEN A. BRUCE AND MONA BRUCE LIVING TRUST EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF RICHARD SPITZ DATED JANUARY 20, 2015

1/21/2015: DEFENDANTS STEPHEN A. BRUCE AND STEPHEN A. BRUCE AND MONA BRUCE LIVING TRUST EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF RICHARD SPITZ DATED JANUARY 20, 2015

DEFENDANTS STEPHEN A. BRUCE AND STEPHEN A. BRUCE AND MONA BRUCE LIVING TRUST NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATIONS OF

1/29/2015: DEFENDANTS STEPHEN A. BRUCE AND STEPHEN A. BRUCE AND MONA BRUCE LIVING TRUST NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATIONS OF

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BRUCE'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

2/18/2015: OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BRUCE'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

DEFENDANTS STEPHEN A. BRUCE AND STEPHEN A. BRUCE AND MONA BRUCE LIVING TRUST NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

4/14/2015: DEFENDANTS STEPHEN A. BRUCE AND STEPHEN A. BRUCE AND MONA BRUCE LIVING TRUST NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

324 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • Docketat 4:15 PM in Department 50; Court Order (Court Order; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Adam M. Klotz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • DocketREMITTITUR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • DocketUnknown Document Type; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Adam M. Klotz (Plaintiff); Richard A. Spitz (Plaintiff); Sagemill Capital Advisors, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
673 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2013
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Adam M. Klotz (Plaintiff); Richard A. Spitz (Plaintiff); Sagemill Capital Advisors, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT STEPHEN A. BRUCE AND REQUEST TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AT TIME OF DEPOSITION; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION; NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; AND ADR INFORMATION PACKAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Adam M. Klotz (Plaintiff); Richard A. Spitz (Plaintiff); Sagemill Capital Advisors, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Adam M. Klotz (Plaintiff); Richard A. Spitz (Plaintiff); Sagemill Capital Advisors, LLC (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: I. DECLARATORY JUDGMENT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KEESAL SAMUEL AARON JR

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEIXLER BERT H.