This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2019 at 02:51:40 (UTC).

ADAM DEFRANCE VS MIDTOWN CARPET CO ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/29/2016 ADAM DEFRANCE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MIDTOWN CARPET CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5225

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DEFRANCE ADAM

Defendants and Respondents

MIDTOWN CARPET CO

DOES 1-20

GAFOURI QAYUM

MIDTOWN CARPET COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

STEINER & LIBO PC

Defendant Attorney

SHAPIRO MARC S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

3/29/2016: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

SUMMONS

3/29/2016: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/5/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

GENERAL DENIAL

4/28/2016: GENERAL DENIAL

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY

6/27/2016: ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

7/6/2016: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

7/6/2016: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Unknown

8/5/2016: Unknown

Unknown

8/9/2016: Unknown

Unknown

8/11/2016: Unknown

Minute Order

8/11/2016: Minute Order

STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE; ORDER

3/2/2017: STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE; ORDER

Unknown

6/15/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

7/19/2017: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order

8/4/2017: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/22/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 30; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 30; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 30; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Receipt; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2016
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Qayum Gafouri (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Association of Attorney; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • General Denial; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Adam DeFrance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MIDTOWN CARPET COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAPIRO MARC S