This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2019 at 12:24:36 (UTC).

ABDORREZZA MOVASSAGHI ET AL VS ALEXANDER GILANIANS ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/15/2016 ABDORREZZA MOVASSAGHI filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against ALEXANDER GILANIANS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4164

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

MOVASSAGHI ABDORREZZA

MOVASSAGHI MARIA

Defendants and Respondents

GILANIANS ALEXANDER

ALEXANDER GILANIANS APC

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

Cross Defendant

MG & AM INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF BEHROUZ SHAFIE & ASSOCIATE

SHAFIE BEHROUZ

Defendant Attorney

GILANIANS ALEXANDER

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/26/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANT ALEX GILANIANS, APC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ATTENDANCE OF PLAINTIFF ABDORREZZA MOVASSAGHI FOR DEPOSITION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF, DECLARATION

4/13/2018: DEFENDANT ALEX GILANIANS, APC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ATTENDANCE OF PLAINTIFF ABDORREZZA MOVASSAGHI FOR DEPOSITION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF, DECLARATION

PLAINTIFFS', ABDORREZZA MOVASSAGHI AND MARIA MOVASSAGHI, OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; ETC

4/17/2018: PLAINTIFFS', ABDORREZZA MOVASSAGHI AND MARIA MOVASSAGHI, OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; ETC

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD

8/1/2018: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

8/2/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE ANY EXPERT TESTIMONY PROFFERRED BY PLAINTIFFS AT TRIAL; ETC.

9/28/2018: DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE ANY EXPERT TESTIMONY PROFFERRED BY PLAINTIFFS AT TRIAL; ETC.

Reply

10/5/2018: Reply

Trial Brief

10/26/2018: Trial Brief

Exhibit List

10/26/2018: Exhibit List

Substitution of Attorney

10/26/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Declaration

11/1/2018: Declaration

Exhibit List

11/1/2018: Exhibit List

Notice

11/5/2018: Notice

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

2/27/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

Unknown

3/10/2017: Unknown

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

3/14/2017: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Unknown

3/14/2017: Unknown

DEFENDANTS' SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES AND COMPLIANCE WITH DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE

6/30/2017: DEFENDANTS' SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES AND COMPLIANCE WITH DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE

100 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 19; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Abdorrezza Movassaghi (Plaintiff); Maria Movassaghi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Trial Brief; Filed by Maria Movassaghi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 19; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Declaration of Behrouz Shafie, ESQ. Regarding Pending Bankruptcy; Filed by Abdorrezza Movassaghi (Plaintiff); Maria Movassaghi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Cross-Complainant Alex Gilanians, APLC's Statement of the Case; Filed by Abdorrezza Movassaghi (Plaintiff); Maria Movassaghi (Plaintiff); APC Alexander Gilanians (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Defendants' Exhibit List; Filed by APC Alexander Gilanians (Defendant); Alexander Gilanians (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
208 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2016
  • Summons on Cross Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Summons; Filed by APC Alexander Gilanians (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Answer; Filed by APC Alexander Gilanians (Defendant); Alexander Gilanians (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Abdorrezza Movassaghi (Plaintiff); Maria Movassaghi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR: (1) DAMAGES FOR FRAUD AND DECEIT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MG & AM INC. DBA AXIS HOME IMPROVEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GILANIANS ALEXANDER