This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 23:12:12 (UTC).

ABCS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS. AVEDICK HACOPIAN

Case Summary

On 11/06/2015 ABCS INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AVEDICK HACOPIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4444

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABCS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

HOCOPIAN TODICK

HACOPIAN TELMICK

HACOPIAN AVEDICK

HACOPIAN ARIGA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KASHANI JACOB K. LAW OFFICE OF

PETERSEN JOHN HOWARD

Defendant Attorneys

KAZANDJIAN YEZNIK O. LAW OFFICES OF

KAZANDJIAN YEZNIK OHANNES

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/6/2015: Notice of Case Management Conference

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

3/11/2016: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Legacy Document

3/17/2016: Legacy Document

Minute Order

3/25/2016: Minute Order

Answer

5/6/2016: Answer

Legacy Document

4/3/2017: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

4/3/2017: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

4/3/2017: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

4/3/2017: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

4/3/2017: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

4/28/2017: Legacy Document

Minute Order

5/11/2017: Minute Order

Legacy Document

12/8/2017: Legacy Document

Minute Order

8/6/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/10/2018: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

12/21/2018: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

2/25/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/8/2019: Minute Order

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial (and Final Status Conference) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial and Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Status Conference (reSetting of Mediation) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial (and Final Status Conference) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial and Final Status Conference; Status Conference...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (for parties failure to participate in Mandatory Settlement Conference) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial (and Final Status Conference) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by ABCS Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: for parties failure to participate in...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Sanctions for parties failure to Participate in MSC and comply with the Court's Order) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • Minute order entered: 2016-01-20 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • Notice of Hearing on Demurrer; Filed by Avedick Hacopian (Defendant); Telmick Hacopian (Defendant); Ariga Hacopian (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • Notice of Motion; Filed by Avedick Hacopian (Defendant); Telmick Hacopian (Defendant); Ariga Hacopian (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by Avedick Hacopian (Defendant); Telmick Hacopian (Defendant); Ariga Hacopian (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ABCS Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less