This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/16/2020 at 08:20:00 (UTC).

ABCO LEASING INC VS PINK P INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/07/2010 ABCO LEASING INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PINK P INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RALPH W. DAU, MATTHEW ST. GEORGE and BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7202

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RALPH W. DAU

MATTHEW ST. GEORGE

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABCO LEASING INC.

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

NARIMANZADEH MOSTAFA

NUTRI PARTNERS INC.

PINK P. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JORGENSEN JEANNE M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF ROWAN R. CLARK IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION DIRECTED TO MARK FORMAN ON BEHALF OF MARYLAND ESTATES, INC. IC.C.P. 708.1201

5/4/2011: DECLARATION OF ROWAN R. CLARK IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION DIRECTED TO MARK FORMAN ON BEHALF OF MARYLAND ESTATES, INC. IC.C.P. 708.1201

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION (ATTACHMENT ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT)

5/6/2011: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION (ATTACHMENT ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT)

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERV!CECIVIL

6/2/2011: PROOF OF PERSONAL SERV!CECIVIL

Minute Order -

7/8/2011: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

7/13/2011: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

8/29/2011: Minute Order -

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2016
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • DocketWrit of Execution; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2011
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 1A; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2011
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2011
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 1A; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2011
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2011
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 1A; (Suppl Exam Of Judgment Debtor; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2011
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2011
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 1A; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2010
  • DocketApplication for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.; Filed by Abco Leasing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • DocketApplication for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.; Filed by Abco Leasing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • DocketPoints and Authorities; Filed by Abco Leasing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Abco Leasing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2010
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2010
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2010
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2010
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Abco Leasing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2010
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF WRITTEN LEASE AGREERV1ENT; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PINK P. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where NUTRI PARTNERS INC. DBA ROBEK'S JUICE is a litigant

Latest cases where ABCO LEASING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JORGENSEN JEANNE M. ESQ.