This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2020 at 02:22:22 (UTC).

ABC SOLAR INC. VS. SUNPOWER INC.

Case Summary

On 10/15/2012 ABC SOLAR INC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against SUNPOWER INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAMONA G. SEE and DUDLEY W. GRAY II. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7960

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2012

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAMONA G. SEE

DUDLEY W. GRAY II

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ABC SOLAR INCORPORATED

NEALE ADA

NEALE BERNARD J.

ROES 1 THROUGH 25

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 25

SUNPOWER INCORPORATED

Cross Plaintiff

SUNPOWER CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF EUGENE E. KINSEY

Defendant Attorney

ATKINSON ANDELSON LOYA RUUD & ROMO

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL? CIVIL

3/21/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL? CIVIL

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

3/21/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL? CIVIL

5/27/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL? CIVIL

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • DocketAnswer to Cross-Complaint; Filed by ABC SOLAR INCORPORATED (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by ABC SOLAR INCORPORATED (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • DocketAffidavit of Mailing; Filed by ABC SOLAR INCORPORATED (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by SUNPOWER INCORPORATED (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • DocketSummons; Filed by SUNPOWER CORPORATION (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/24/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; (OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by SUNPOWER INCORPORATED (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by SUNPOWER INCORPORATED (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by SUNPOWER INCORPORATED (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • DocketMotion to Strike; Filed by SUNPOWER INCORPORATED (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by ABC SOLAR INCORPORATED (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • DocketSummons; Filed by ABC SOLAR INCORPORATED (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by ABC SOLAR INCORPORATED (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABC SOLAR INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where Sunpower Corporation Systems is a litigant