This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/05/2021 at 15:06:38 (UTC).

AARON WULF VS 5354 LINDLEY CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS'

Case Summary

On 02/05/2008 AARON WULF filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 5354 LINDLEY CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS'. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES A. KADDO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0424

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAMES A. KADDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WULF JAN MORGAN

WULF AARON

WULF SETH

Defendants

COURT CHARLOTTE

5354 LINDLEY CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS'

WEISS LAUREN

HAJIAN JACKIE SHAMS

AMERICAN CERTIFIED MOLD INSPECTORS

ROSS MORGAN & COMPANY

MIDA INDUSTRIES INC.

DOES 1-100

ABUGOW MICHAEL

SHAFT MARLENE

THE CONDO MANAGERS

Not Classified By Court

BROWN BARBARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRENCH ELIZABETH A.

Defendant Attorneys

BENJAMIN BRUCE DAVID

ANDERSON ET AL

REAGAN BARRY JAMES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/06/2017

DocketPaper file destroyed; Filed by Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2009

Docketat 08:30 am in Department NWI, JAMES A. KADDO, Presiding; OSC-Dismissal - Dismissal-No appearance

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2009

DocketRequest-Dismissal-Partial (with prejudice;x-comp filed by Media on 3/25/08 ); Filed by Attorney for Deft/X-Complainant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2009

DocketRequest-Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE;COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2009

DocketRequest-Dismissal-Partial (WITH PREJUDICE;X-COMP FILED BY AMERICAN CERTIFED MOLD INSPECTORS ON 9/11/08 ); Filed by Attorney-Defendant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/12/2009

Docketat 10:00 am in Department ADRO, ADR Neutral, Presiding; Closed-ADR (2/17/09BARBARA BROWN, MEDIATOR) - Not Held-Removed ADR-Private Med

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2009

Docketat 08:30 am in Department NWI, JAMES A. KADDO, Presiding; Conference-Mandatory Settlement (mediation to be completed by02/23/09) - Off calendar

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2009

DocketMisc-Other (PP) (first statement of agreement or nonagreement filed mediation did not take place due to parties settled case at private mediation. ); Filed by Mediator

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2009

DocketNotice-Order to Show Cause (RE: DISMISSAL ); Filed by Attorney-Defendant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2009

DocketNotice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney-Defendant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
50 More Docket Entries
04/01/2008

DocketProof of Service-Summons & Com; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2008

DocketNotice-Change-Firm Name & Addr; Filed by Attorney-Defendant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2008

DocketDemurrer; Filed by Attorney-Defendant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2008

DocketMotion-Strike; Filed by Attorney-Defendant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/25/2008

DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney-Defendant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/25/2008

DocketAnswer; Filed by Attorney-Defendant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/25/2008

DocketComplaint-Cross (MIDA VS. WULF **dismissed on 4/15/09** ); Filed by Attorney-Defendant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2008

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2008

DocketSummons-Issued; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2008

DocketNotice-Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less