This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/03/2020 at 01:28:33 (UTC).

AAC DESIGNERS BUILDERS INC VS SUNRIDER MANUFACTURING LP ET A

Case Summary

On 12/01/2008 AAC DESIGNERS BUILDERS INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SUNRIDER MANUFACTURING LP ET A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2951

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

AAC DESIGNERS BUILDERS INC.

AUSTIN/AECOM

Defendants and Respondents

ARCHITECTURAL DOORS INC.

BLUE DIAMOND MATERIALS

COMMERCIAL PETROLEUM EQUIPMENT CORPORATI-

DIVISION 3 CONSTRUCTION SERVICES INC.

ELLEND GREG

PRECISION STAINLESS INC.

SLUNAKER CONSTRUCTION

SLUNAKER GREGORY

SUNBELT RENTALS COMPANY

SUNLIFE HERBAL COMPANY INC.

SUNLIFE HOLDINGS LLC

SUNRIDER MANUFACTURING L.P.

SUNWEST ELECTRIC INC.

UNIVERSITY MARELICH MECHANICAL INC.

WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STRONG KENNETH F. ESQ.

GORDON & REES LLP

Defendant Attorney

SALAMONE MARY A. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/16/2010

Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2010

Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2009

Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2009

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2009

DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2009

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by AAC Designers Builders, Inc. (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2009

Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (MOTION - COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES; Off Calendar) -

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2009

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2009

DocketAAC DESIGNERS BUILDERS, INC.'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE), ETC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2009

DocketNOTICE OF AAC DESIGNERS BUILDERS, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE), ETC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
52 More Docket Entries
02/10/2009

Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 39; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Matter continued) -

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2009

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2009

Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 322; Court Order - Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2008

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2008

DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2008

DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2008

DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2008

DocketCOMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MECHANIC'S BREACH OF CONTRACT, ACCOUNT STATED, ETC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2008

DocketSUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2008

DocketComplaint; Filed by AAC Designers Builders, Inc. (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less