Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2021 at 04:14:37 (UTC).

AAA T L C HEALTH CARE INC VS KENDRA WALKER ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/09/2013 AAA T L C HEALTH CARE INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KENDRA WALKER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5373

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

AAA T.L.C. HEALTH CARE INC.

Defendants and Respondents

DOE 1 THROUGH DOE 25

PADWAY LAURENCE

WALKER KENDRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

APPLETON PETER M.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

PADWAY LAURENCE F.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

4/9/2013: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT; COMMON COUNTS, AND FRAUD

4/9/2013: COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT; COMMON COUNTS, AND FRAUD

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/11/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/7/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

ANSWER-CONTRACT -

7/18/2013: ANSWER-CONTRACT -

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/29/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

TRIAL BRIEF

9/4/2013: TRIAL BRIEF

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

9/4/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

9/6/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

9/11/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

UPDATED CASE MANAGEMT STATEMENT

9/26/2013: UPDATED CASE MANAGEMT STATEMENT

MINUTE ORDER

10/9/2013: MINUTE ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2017
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • Docketat 09:00 am in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Case Dismissed/Disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other (UPDATED CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (Complaint as to LAURENCE F. PADWAY only ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2013
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • DocketBrief (TRIAL BRIEF ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • DocketProof of Service (OF NTC OF CMC ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2013
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AAA T.L.C. HEALTH CARE INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PADWAY, LAURENCE F.