Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/03/2021 at 21:42:33 (UTC).

AAA T L C HEALTH CARE INC VS HALAYNE S KASSOFF ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/24/2009 AAA T L C HEALTH CARE INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HALAYNE S KASSOFF. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARY ANN MURPHY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6850

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARY ANN MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

AAA T.L.C. HEALTH CARE INC.

Defendants and Respondents

DOE 1 THROUGH DOE 25

KASSOFF HALAYNE S.

KASSOFF LESLYE

Not Classified By Court

MULHOLLAND JAMES S. ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

APPLETON PETER M. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

SCOTT LINDA LOUISE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2016
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2010
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2010
  • Docketin Department ADR, ADR Neutral, Presiding; Closed-ADR - Not Held-Rmvd ADR-Dismissed prior

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2010
  • Docketin Department 25, Mary Ann Murphy, Presiding; Court Order - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • DocketRequest and Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2010
  • DocketAnswer to First Amended Complaint (BY LESLYE KASOFF ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2010
  • DocketNotice-Assignment-Mediator; Filed by ADR Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2010
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2010
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2010
  • Docketat 08:31 am in Department 25, Mary Ann Murphy, Presiding; DEMURRER (2. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;) - Demurrer sustained with leave

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2010
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2010
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2010
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 25, Mary Ann Murphy, Presiding; OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv (ALL DEFENDANTS) - Discharged

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2010
  • DocketOpposition Document (TO DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT LESLYE KASOFF ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2010
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint (BY HALAYNE S KASOFF ); Filed by Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2010
  • DocketDemurrer (TO COMPLAINT ); Filed by Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2010
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2009
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2009
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2009
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AAA T.L.C. HEALTH CARE INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCOTT LINDA LOUISE