This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 10:00:25 (UTC).

A S ET AL VS CULVER CITY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/14/2015 A S filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CULVER CITY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DANIEL S. MURPHY and CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9438

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DANIEL S. MURPHY

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Guardian Ad Litem

T. TIFFANY

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

STUDENT B A MINOR

CULVER CITY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

WEAVER JEREMY

STUDENT A A MINOR

DOES 1-100

Cross Defendants and Respondents

IRVINE DAMIEN

WEAVER JEREMY

GAMMAGE PAUL

JOHNSON KAREN

WILLIAMS ODETTA

E.I. A MINOR

C.G. A MINOR

MINOR C.G. A

MINOR E.I. A

Others

STUDENT B

STUDENT A

Guardian Ad Litems

TIFFANY T

T. TIFFANY

Minor

A.S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor and Plaintiff Attorneys

YEDIDSION JONATI

NAVAB LAW

DESIMONE VINCENT JAMES

NAVAB KAVEH

YEDIDSON SEBER YEDIDSION LLP

Other, Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GIBEAUT GARY ROBERT ESQ.

GIBEAUT GARY R.

DANA JOHN MCCUNE ESQ.

MCCUNE & HARBER

GIBEAUT MAHAN & BRISCOE

Other Attorneys

QUILLER DOMINIC A

 

Court Documents

Declaration

4/24/2019: Declaration

Opposition

4/24/2019: Opposition

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 1. NEGLIGENCE (GOV?T. CODE ? 815.2 & 815.6); ETC.

4/2/2015: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 1. NEGLIGENCE (GOV?T. CODE ? 815.2 & 815.6); ETC.

Declaration

4/24/2019: Declaration

Motion in Limine

4/15/2019: Motion in Limine

Declaration

4/24/2019: Declaration

Stipulation and Order

5/30/2019: Stipulation and Order

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/17/2015: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS

3/16/2015: SUMMONS

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, CULVER CITY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/17/2015: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, CULVER CITY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Stipulation and Order

4/26/2019: Stipulation and Order

Opposition

4/24/2019: Opposition

Motion in Limine

4/24/2019: Motion in Limine

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENT SUPERVISION OF STUDENTS (GOV'T. CODE ?815.6); ETC

1/14/2015: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENT SUPERVISION OF STUDENTS (GOV'T. CODE ?815.6); ETC

Declaration

4/24/2019: Declaration

CIVIL DEPOSIT

1/14/2015: CIVIL DEPOSIT

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

6/2/2015: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

1/14/2015: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2019
  • Hearingat 10:00 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • Hearingat 09:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketJoint Stipulated Protective Order; [Proposed] Order; Filed by A. S. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Docketat 2:07 PM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
189 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2015
  • DocketCONSENT OF PROPOSED GUARDIAN, NOMINATION OF GUARDIAN, AND CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AND WAIVER OF NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY PLAINTIFF A.S., BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, TIFFANY T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEMCIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENT SUPERVISION OF STUDENTS (GOV'T. CODE 815.6); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.