This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2019 at 00:32:18 (UTC).

6360 VAN NUYS LLC VS LUIZA PETROSYAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/21/2015 6360 VAN NUYS LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LUIZA PETROSYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOLLY E. KENDIG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2673

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HOLLY E. KENDIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

6360 VAN NUYS LLC

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 50

GOLOBORODKO VALADYSLAY

HSBC

HSBC BANK USA N.A.

J.P. MORGAN CHASE & CO.

MENALLED RUBEN

PETROSYAN LUIZA

PLM LENDER SERVICES INC.

WILSHIRE FINANCE PARTNERS INC.

Other

SEGURA STEVE R. ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LD LAW OFFICES

SEGURA STEVE R. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

KIRBY & MCGUINN APC

KATTEN MUCHIN ROSENMAN LLP

KOHLES MONICA

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES DUE TO: (1) NEGLIGENCE; ETC

5/21/2015: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES DUE TO: (1) NEGLIGENCE; ETC

DEFENDANT WILSHIRE FINANCE PARTNERS, INC.'S REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

6/22/2015: DEFENDANT WILSHIRE FINANCE PARTNERS, INC.'S REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT HSBC BANK USA, N.A.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

6/26/2015: DEFENDANT HSBC BANK USA, N.A.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Service

7/29/2015: Proof of Service

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY

10/1/2015: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

10/9/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

APPLICATION BY DEFENDANTS WILSHIRE FINANCE PARTNERS, INC., AND PLM LENDER SERVICES, INC. FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ?877.6, ET SEQ.; DECLARATION OF

3/8/2016: APPLICATION BY DEFENDANTS WILSHIRE FINANCE PARTNERS, INC., AND PLM LENDER SERVICES, INC. FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ?877.6, ET SEQ.; DECLARATION OF

REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS WILSHIRE FINANCE PARTNERS, INC. MID PLM LENDER SERVICES, INC.'S APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVI

3/8/2016: REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS WILSHIRE FINANCE PARTNERS, INC. MID PLM LENDER SERVICES, INC.'S APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVI

Minute Order

4/8/2016: Minute Order

ORDER ON APPLICATION REGARDING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

4/11/2016: ORDER ON APPLICATION REGARDING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF RULING AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/18/2016: NOTICE OF RULING AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DECLARATION OF MONICA A. KOHLES PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ? 430.41

7/12/2016: DECLARATION OF MONICA A. KOHLES PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ? 430.41

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/18/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

9/9/2016: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Minute Order

10/4/2016: Minute Order

HSBC BANK USA, N.A'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

10/7/2016: HSBC BANK USA, N.A'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO HSBC'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/11/2016: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO HSBC'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF RULING RE: HSBC BANK USA, N.A.'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

10/18/2016: NOTICE OF RULING RE: HSBC BANK USA, N.A.'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTTY OF JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF HSBC BANK USA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by HSBC Bank, USA, N.A. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Judgment; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL IN FAVOR OF HSBC BANK USA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE: HSBC BANK USA, N.A.'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by HSBC Bank, USA, N.A. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • at 08:32 AM in Department 42; Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO HSBC'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Opposition Document; Filed by 6360 Van Nuys, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
93 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2015
  • DECLARATION OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • DECLARATION OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT BY PLAINTIFF 6360 VAN NUYS, LLC; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • DEFENDANT WILSHIRE FINANCE PARTNERS, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • DECLARATION OF TRUSTEE'S NON-MONETARY STATUS BY DEFENDANT PLM LENDER SERVICES, INC. TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE SECTION 29241

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by 6360 Van Nuys, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES DUE TO: (1) NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

LEONARDO DRUBACH - SBN 161339

LD LAW OFFICES

6422 Coldwater Canyon Avenue, Suite 211

North Hollywood, CA 91606 FILED Telephone: (818) 477-4740 s‘”’%%‘f’m'?r‘i?&“&%‘l%%é{%‘”‘ A

E-Mail: leo@ldloca.com

0CT 11 2016

Attorneys for Plaintiff 6360 VAN NUYS, LLC SherriR. C ecutive Officer/Clerk Byfiw_fl Deputy | ya Bo

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

6360 VAN NUYS, LLC Case No. BC582673 ' (Assigned to Hon. Holly Kendig, Dept. 42) Plaintiff,

PLAINTIFF’S OPPOSITION TO HSBC’S

Vs. MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE

PLEADINGS-FIRST AMENDED

LUIZA PETROSYAN; JP MORGAN CHASE| COMPLAINT & CO; HSBC BANK, USA aka HSBC; PLM LENDER SERVICES, INC.; WILSHIRE Date: October 14, 2016 FINANCE PARTNERS, INC.; Time: 8:30 a.m. VALADYSLAY GOLOBORODKO; RUBEN| Dept.: 42 MENALLED and DOES 1 to 50, Inclusive, Complaint Filed: May 21, 2015

Defendants.

Comes Now Plaintiff 6360 Van Nuys, LLC (*6360’) and submits the following Opposition to the Motion of Defendant HSBC Bank, USA (“HSBC”) for Judgment on the Pleadings:

STATEMENT OF FACTS

The Plaintiff is 6360. The remaining Defendants are Luiza Petrosyan (“Petrosyan”) and HSBC. The gravamen of the action pertains to residential real property located at 826 South Sunse Canyon Drive, Burbank, CA 91501 (“subject property””) and an agreed upon “short sale” of the

subject property where Petrosyan agreed to sell the subject property to 6360 and HSBC agreed to