This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2019 at 12:39:30 (UTC).

612 N FULLER AVE LLC VS Y E GARAGE DOOR GATES & IRONWORKS

Case Summary

On 10/25/2016 612 N FULLER AVE LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Y E GARAGE DOOR GATES IRONWORKS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5751

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

612 N FULLER AVE LLC

Defendant and Respondent

Y E GARAGE DOOR GATES & IRONWORKS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

AGAM NATHAN

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTY FROM LIEN [CAL. CIVIL CODE ? 84901 AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY?S FEES; DECLARATION OF NATHAN AGAM; AND PROPOSED] ORDER

10/25/2016: PETITION FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTY FROM LIEN [CAL. CIVIL CODE ? 84901 AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY?S FEES; DECLARATION OF NATHAN AGAM; AND PROPOSED] ORDER

Proof of Service

11/23/2016: Proof of Service

ORDER RELEASING PROPERTY FROM LIENS AND AWARDING ATTORNEY'S FEES

12/8/2016: ORDER RELEASING PROPERTY FROM LIENS AND AWARDING ATTORNEY'S FEES

Minute Order

12/8/2016: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2016
  • at 09:15 AM in Department 44; Hearing on Petition to Release Property-Mechanic's Lien - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • ORDER RELEASING PROPERTY FROM LIENS AND AWARDING ATTORNEY'S FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Notice of Hearing; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • PETITION FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTY FROM LIEN [CAL. CIVIL CODE 84901 AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY S FEES; DECLARATION OF NATHAN AGAM; AND PROPOSED] ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 612 N FULLER AVE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AGAM NATHAN