This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 01:13:21 (UTC).

612 N FULLER AVE LLC VS RED DIAMOND STEEL INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/03/2016 612 N FULLER AVE LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against RED DIAMOND STEEL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2430

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

612 N FULLER AVE LLC

Defendants and Respondents

NOBLE ELECTRIC

MIA MARBLE & TILE INC.

T & U ROOFING

DAN-SON AIR

RED DIAMOND STEEL INC.

Y E GARAGE DOOR GATES & IRONWORK

AIR DAN-SON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

AGAM INTERNATIONAL INC.

 

Court Documents

Unknown

9/27/2018: Unknown

PETITION FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTY FROM LIEN [CAL. CIVIL CODE ? 8490]

5/3/2016: PETITION FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTY FROM LIEN [CAL. CIVIL CODE ? 8490]

PROOF OF SERVICE

5/23/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTY FROM LIEN

5/23/2016: NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTY FROM LIEN

Minute Order

6/16/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTY FROM LIEN

6/17/2016: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTY FROM LIEN

PROOF OF SERVICE

6/17/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE

Minute Order

7/1/2016: Minute Order

Proof of Service

7/1/2016: Proof of Service

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PETITIONER FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE SECTION 8488; ETC

7/7/2016: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PETITIONER FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE SECTION 8488; ETC

Proof of Service

7/7/2016: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

7/7/2016: Proof of Service

NOTICE OF RULING AND PROPOSED ORDER RELEASING PROPERTY FROM LIENS

7/7/2016: NOTICE OF RULING AND PROPOSED ORDER RELEASING PROPERTY FROM LIENS

ORDER RELEASING PROPERTY FROM LIENS

7/18/2016: ORDER RELEASING PROPERTY FROM LIENS

Minute Order

9/15/2016: Minute Order

ORDER GRANTING AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES

9/15/2016: ORDER GRANTING AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2018
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • at 09:15 AM in Department 44; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • ORDER GRANTING AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • ORDER RELEASING PROPERTY FROM LIENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • Order; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Notice of Motion; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • NOTICE OF RULING AND PROPOSED ORDER RELEASING PROPERTY FROM LIENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • at 09:15 AM in Department 44; Hearing on Petition to Release Property-Mechanic's Lien (Hrng; Relse Prop from Mech's Lien; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • Notice; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTY FROM LIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • Notice of Hearing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • PETITION FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTY FROM LIEN [CAL. CIVIL CODE 8490]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NOBLE ELECTRIC is a litigant

Latest cases where T & U ROOFING DBA is a litigant

Latest cases where 612 N FULLER AVE LLC is a litigant