This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2021 at 16:17:58 (UTC).

436 BEVERLY HILLS LLC VS DEENA HUSSEIN

Case Summary

On 06/18/2012 436 BEVERLY HILLS LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DEENA HUSSEIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6576

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

436 BEVERLY HILLS LLC

Defendant

HUSSEIN DEENA

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF 436 BEVERLY HILLS, LLC'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT DEENA HUSSEIN

10/31/2012: PLAINTIFF 436 BEVERLY HILLS, LLC'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT DEENA HUSSEIN

JUDGMENT

10/31/2012: JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

10/31/2012: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

10/31/2012: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Minute Order -

10/31/2012: Minute Order -

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY)

10/31/2012: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY)

DECLARATION OF STEVEN N. NIEBOW IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE: DISMISSAL

10/11/2012: DECLARATION OF STEVEN N. NIEBOW IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE: DISMISSAL

Minute Order -

9/21/2012: Minute Order -

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

8/24/2012: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

7/23/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/5/2012: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS -

6/18/2012: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT: ETC

6/18/2012: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT: ETC

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Finding in favor of Plaintiff) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2012
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2012
  • DocketJUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2012
  • DocketPLAINTIFF 436 BEVERLY HILLS, LLC'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT DEENA HUSSEIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2012
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2012
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2012
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT: ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by 436 Beverly Hills, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less