This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2019 at 13:26:41 (UTC).

4 STREETS CO-OP OF RTE 2 INC VS BASTA INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/27/2016 4 STREETS CO-OP OF RTE 2 INC filed an Other lawsuit against BASTA INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8347

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

4 STREETS CO-OP RTE 2 INC.

Defendants and Respondents

GALDAMEZ JORGE

PARADA CARMEN

PARADA SONIA

BLANCO LUDMILA V.

CABRERA CARMEN

PARADA JOSE M.

BASTA INC.

GALDAMEZ GLORIA E. A

PORTILLO VILMA

CALDERON GILBERTO

GALDAMEZ AZALIA

BETETA MARITZA

GALVAN GUADALUPE

ALVARADO MATTHEW

MARQUEZ MARIO

OLMOS ENRIQUE J.

ESTATE OF HECTOR RIVERA

HERNANDEZ LUIS ANGEL

MEDRANO NIDIA

24 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SWEDELSONGGOTTLIEB

LE CANG N

SWEDELSON DAVID CAS

Defendant Attorneys

POST ERIC M.

RAMM BENJAMIN G.

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

10/11/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

10/11/2018: Substitution of Attorney

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/24/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

DECLARATION OF ANA ZAMORA REGARDING ATTEMPT TO MEET AND CONFER REQUIRED BY CODE CIV. PROC., SECTION 430.41

6/3/2016: DECLARATION OF ANA ZAMORA REGARDING ATTEMPT TO MEET AND CONFER REQUIRED BY CODE CIV. PROC., SECTION 430.41

DEMURRER TO CAUSES OF ACTION 5 AND 6 AND DECLARATION OF GUADALUPE GALVAN

6/3/2016: DEMURRER TO CAUSES OF ACTION 5 AND 6 AND DECLARATION OF GUADALUPE GALVAN

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

7/1/2016: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

7/14/2016: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Unknown

8/8/2016: Unknown

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO JOIN SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE BY CARMEN CABRERA AND MARIA DELGADO

8/8/2016: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO JOIN SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE BY CARMEN CABRERA AND MARIA DELGADO

REQUEST TO WAIVE ADDITIONAL COURT FEES (SUPERIOR COURT)

10/6/2016: REQUEST TO WAIVE ADDITIONAL COURT FEES (SUPERIOR COURT)

Unknown

10/6/2016: Unknown

Unknown

10/6/2016: Unknown

Unknown

10/6/2016: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/27/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Minute Order

7/27/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION

8/29/2017: NOTICE OF LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION

NOTICE OF LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION

8/29/2017: NOTICE OF LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION

NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL

9/8/2017: NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL

397 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees (on Behalf of Defendant Lilian Rivas) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees (on Behalf of Defendant Juan Galvan Jr.) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees (on Behalf of Defendant Jose Parada) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Order to Show Cause Re: (MSC Scheduling) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees (on Behalf of Defendant Saul Galdamez) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees on Behalf of Defendant Sa...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees (on Behalf of Defendant Lilian Rivas) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees (on Behalf of Defendant Jose Parada) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Opposition (to defendant's motion for anti-slap attorney fees); Filed by Jose M. Parada (Defendant); Saul Galdamez (Defendant); Juan Jr. Galvan (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Declaration (Declaration In Support); Filed by 4 Streets Co-Op Rte 2, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
744 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by 4 Streets Co-Op Rte 2, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF FOR: 1). INTENTIONAL INTERFERENCE WITH CONTRACTUAL RELATIONS; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC618347    Hearing Date: December 19, 2019    Dept: 19

Defendant Gilberto Calderon's Motion to Sever is CONTINUED TO 1/23/2019, at 8:30 a.m.

The parties have failed to provide the Court with courtesy copies of briefing filed, in compliance with the General Order Re: E-Filing for Central Civil and Department 19's courtroom information link.

Courtesy copies are ordered to be delivered directly to Department 19 on or before January 6, 2020.

Moving party to give notice.