Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/30/2020 at 12:23:34 (UTC).

360 MEDIA ENTERTAINMENT VS HANNIBAL INC

Case Summary

On 02/13/2009 360 MEDIA ENTERTAINMENT filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HANNIBAL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARY H. STROBEL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7629

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARY H. STROBEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

360 MEDIA ENTERTAINMENT

Defendants

DOES 1 - 10

HANNIBAL INC.

Not Classified By Court

STROTE JOEL R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAVINE VINCENT L.

Defendant Attorney

HAMRICK A. RAYMOND III ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2010
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2010
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) (Mandatory Settlement Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2009
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 32; Court Order (Court Order; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2009
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2009
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2009
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2009
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2009
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32; (Motion to Compel; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2009
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 32; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2009
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2009
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2009
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Hannibal, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2009
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANT HANNIBAL, INC. DBA HANNIBAL PICTURES TO COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF 360 MEDIA ENTERTAINMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2009
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by 360 Media Entertainment (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: BREACH OF CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HANNIBAL INC. DBA HANNIBAL PICTURES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAMRICK III A. RAYMOND