Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/05/2019 at 20:04:54 (UTC).

218 PROPERTIES LLC VS CITY OF CARSON ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/22/2014 218 PROPERTIES LLC filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CITY OF CARSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LUIS A. LAVIN and ROBERT H. O'BRIEN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8169

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LUIS A. LAVIN

ROBERT H. O'BRIEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

218 PROPERTIES LLC

Defendants and Respondents

CARSON CITY OF

CITY OF CARSON MOBILEHOME PARK RENTALAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF DOUGLAS W. BECK & ASSOC.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

SOLTANI SUNNY K.

 

Court Documents

VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF ADMINSTRATIVE MANDATE (CIV. PROC. CODE ? 1094.5)

4/22/2014: VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF ADMINSTRATIVE MANDATE (CIV. PROC. CODE ? 1094.5)

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

4/25/2014: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

VERIFIED ANSWER TO VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDATE

5/22/2014: VERIFIED ANSWER TO VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDATE

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

6/6/2014: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

7/25/2014: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

12/5/2014: MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDAMUS

1/5/2015: OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDAMUS

OBJECTIONS TO PETITIONER'S PROPOSED JUDGMENT AND PROPOSED WRIT OF MANDATE

2/24/2015: OBJECTIONS TO PETITIONER'S PROPOSED JUDGMENT AND PROPOSED WRIT OF MANDATE

Minute Order

3/10/2015: Minute Order

JUDGMENT

3/10/2015: JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO ET ASIDE AND VACATE JUDGMENT &ND FOR ENTRY OF ANOTHER AND DIFFERENT JUDGMENT; `IEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF

7/2/2015: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO ET ASIDE AND VACATE JUDGMENT &ND FOR ENTRY OF ANOTHER AND DIFFERENT JUDGMENT; `IEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF

PROOF OF DELIVERY

7/15/2015: PROOF OF DELIVERY

PROOF OF DELIVERY

7/15/2015: PROOF OF DELIVERY

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE JUDGMENT AND FOR ENTRY OF ANOTHER AND DIFFERENT JUDGMENT

7/20/2015: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE JUDGMENT AND FOR ENTRY OF ANOTHER AND DIFFERENT JUDGMENT

Minute Order

8/11/2015: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

8/20/2015: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND PETITIONER'S OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENTS' PROPOSED AMENDED DECISION ON WRIT OF MANDATE: GRANTED, IN PART

8/20/2015: NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND PETITIONER'S OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENTS' PROPOSED AMENDED DECISION ON WRIT OF MANDATE: GRANTED, IN PART

NOTICE OF AMENDED DECISION ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE: GRANTED, IN PART

8/21/2015: NOTICE OF AMENDED DECISION ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE: GRANTED, IN PART

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2015
  • Notice; Filed by Carson, City of (Defendant); City of Carson Mobilehome Park Rentalal (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • NOTICE OF AMENDED DECISION ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE: GRANTED, IN PART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • Notice; Filed by 218 Properties, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • Association of Attorney; Filed by 218 Properties, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND PETITIONER'S OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENTS' PROPOSED AMENDED DECISION ON WRIT OF MANDATE: GRANTED, IN PART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • REDLINE OF PROPOSED AMENDED DECISION ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE: GRANTED, IN PART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • Statement of Decision; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • AMENDED DECISION ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE: GRANTED, IN PART

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2014
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • VERIFIED ANSWER TO VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • Answer; Filed by Carson, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF ADMINSTRATIVE MANDATE (CIV. PROC. CODE 1094.5)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 218 PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant