This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 00:21:24 (UTC).

215 STRADA CORTA ROAD, LLC VS GLAESER BUILDERS, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/09/2015 215 STRADA CORTA ROAD, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GLAESER BUILDERS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF, RICHARD A. STONE, MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL and CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3609

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

RICHARD A. STONE

MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

215 STRADA CORTA ROAD LLC

Defendants and Cross Defendants

GLAESER BUILDERS INC.

PERLMAN BARRY

CONCRETE DESIGNS INC.

P.C. ROOFING

ANDERSON MOULDING DOORS AND WINDOWS

MONTESANO GENE

CONWAY PATRICK

NOVUS GEOCONSULTANTA

LUCKY CHIMNEY COMPANY. THE

PREFERRED PROTECTION

RAGUSA CONSTRUCTION

K&A DEVELOPMENT INC.

SIERRA PACAFIC WINDOWS

BETO'S LIGHTING AND OUTLET ELECTRICAL

SOUTH CAL MASONRY INC.

LUCKY CHIMNEY COMPANY INC. THE

FOX SHEET METAL

GENESIS HEATING AND AIR

FOX LARRY

24 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RAMEY LAW

DODDY JAMES

LAW RAMEY

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

BERMAN EVAN A.

CAPPELLO & NOEL

BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA

WEISSMAN ROBERT A.

KABAHAR BRYAN

KENNEDY & SOUZA

DUN & MARTINEK

WRIGHT PAUL J ATTORNEY AT LAW

KIRWIN P. MARK

LAW FIRM OF KIRWIN & FRANCIS LLP

GLAUBIGER DAVID

ORLAND LAW GROUP

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL

12/2/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

4/13/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

4/22/2015: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

1/27/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

3/20/2015: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

MOTION I OPPOSITION I STIPULATION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER

4/24/2015: MOTION I OPPOSITION I STIPULATION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER

CROSS-DEFENDANT PATRICK CONWAY DBA PC. ROOFING'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S GLAESER BUILDER, INC.

12/2/2015: CROSS-DEFENDANT PATRICK CONWAY DBA PC. ROOFING'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S GLAESER BUILDER, INC.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

3/20/2015: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY K& A DEVELEOPMENT, INC. ON JULY 22, 2016; *EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS COSTS AND FEES ); Filed by Attorney for X-Deft/X-Comp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by K&A Development, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • at 09:00 AM in Department M; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • at 09:00 am in Department WEM, Mitchell L. Beckloff, Presiding; OSC-Failure to File Dism. or Judg. (RE TRANSFER OF SETTLEMENT CHECKS;DISMISSAL FILED) - Advanced to this date & Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Sierra Pacific Windows (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY TRENT MERRILL & BARRY PERLMAN, ON 5/10/16 AS TO TRENT MERRILL, BARRY PERLMAN, AND DOES 1 TO 100 ONLY ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY BEV HILLS PROP HOLDINGS IV, LLC, ET AL ON 5/10/16; AS TO BEVERLY HILLS HILLS PROPERTY HOLDINGS, IV, LLC ONLY ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY SIERRA PACIFIC WINDOWS AND EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS COSTS AND FEES ); Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by TRENT MERRILL (Defendant); Barry Perlman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Beverly Hills Property Holdings IV, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
474 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2015
  • Answer; Filed by Glaeser Builders, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Court Makes Order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • at 08:30 am in Department WEM, Richard A. Stone, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Court Makes Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by 215 STRADA CORTA ROAD, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by 215 STRADA CORTA ROAD, LLC (Plaintiff); Matthew Johnson (Plaintiff); Venus Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.