This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2019 at 19:24:13 (UTC).

1999 SYCAMORE LLC VS YAMASHIRO INC

Case Summary

On 03/16/2016 1999 SYCAMORE LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against YAMASHIRO INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3762

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

1999 SYCAMORE LLC

Defendant

YAMASHIRO INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RANDY S. SNYDER LAW OFFICES

Defendant Attorneys

SOHAILA SAGHEB LAW OFFICE OF

APC GEORGE M. ROSENBERG

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS (UNLAWFUL DETAINER

3/16/2016: SUMMONS (UNLAWFUL DETAINER

COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

3/16/2016: COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

3/18/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

3/24/2016: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

DECLARATION OF THOMAS GLOVER SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION PENDING DETERMINATION OF CIVIL ACTION

3/29/2016: DECLARATION OF THOMAS GLOVER SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION PENDING DETERMINATION OF CIVIL ACTION

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STAY UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATIONS OF THOMAS GLOVER AND CARLOS ULLOA SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT THEREOF

3/29/2016: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STAY UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATIONS OF THOMAS GLOVER AND CARLOS ULLOA SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT THEREOF

DECLARATION OF CARLOS ULLOA SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION PENDING DETERMINATION OF CIVIL ACTION

3/29/2016: DECLARATION OF CARLOS ULLOA SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION PENDING DETERMINATION OF CIVIL ACTION

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT YAMASHIRO, INC. TO COMPLAINT ALLEGING UNLAWFUL DETAINER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT THEREOF

3/29/2016: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT YAMASHIRO, INC. TO COMPLAINT ALLEGING UNLAWFUL DETAINER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT THEREOF

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/1/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/1/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

4/1/2016: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

OPPOS TO EX PARTE TO ADVANCE HEARINGS ON DEMURRER MOTION TO STAY

4/15/2016: OPPOS TO EX PARTE TO ADVANCE HEARINGS ON DEMURRER MOTION TO STAY

ORDER ADVANCING HEARINGS ON DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO FOR STAY

4/15/2016: ORDER ADVANCING HEARINGS ON DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO FOR STAY

Minute Order

4/15/2016: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO FOR STAY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF RANDY S. SNYDER IN SUPPORT THEREOF; [PROPOSED]

4/15/2016: PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO FOR STAY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF RANDY S. SNYDER IN SUPPORT THEREOF; [PROPOSED]

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

4/22/2016: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

4/22/2016: OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR STAY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLATION OF ROBERT HARO

4/22/2016: OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR STAY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLATION OF ROBERT HARO

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50; Status Conference (Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketNOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketNOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketNOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Docketat 08:32 AM in Department 50; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2016
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Yamashiro, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • DocketMotion; Filed by Yamashiro, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by 1999 Sycamore, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS (UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by 1999 Sycamore, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less