This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2019 at 06:12:22 (UTC).

11906 SAN VICENTE LLC VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 03/23/2015 11906 SAN VICENTE LLC filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4425

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

11906 SAN VICENTE LLC

Defendant

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEFFER MANGELS BUTLER & MITCHELL LLP

Defendant Attorney

BROTHERS AMY DEPUTY CITY ATTORNEY

 

Court Documents

VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

3/23/2015: VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

SUMMONS ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

3/23/2015: SUMMONS ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

3/25/2015: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

3/26/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

3/30/2015: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Minute Order

6/23/2015: Minute Order

DISCLOSURE BY THE COURT

6/23/2015: DISCLOSURE BY THE COURT

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

6/23/2015: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

10/7/2015: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

10/13/2015: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Minute Order

10/29/2015: Minute Order

ANSWER OF CITY OF LOS ANGELES

11/6/2015: ANSWER OF CITY OF LOS ANGELES

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

3/7/2016: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

PETITIONER'S OPENING BRIEF

3/7/2016: PETITIONER'S OPENING BRIEF

CITY OF LOS ANGELES' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO WRIT

4/5/2016: CITY OF LOS ANGELES' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO WRIT

PETITIONER'S REPLY BRIEF

4/20/2016: PETITIONER'S REPLY BRIEF

PETITIONER'S NOTICE OF LODGING ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD VOLUMES 1-2

4/20/2016: PETITIONER'S NOTICE OF LODGING ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD VOLUMES 1-2

Minute Order

5/5/2016: Minute Order

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2016
  • DocketStipulation; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • DocketSTIPULATION TO EXTEND CITY'S TIME TO TAX COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • DocketMEMO COSTS SUMMARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • DocketMemo of Costs; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL OF ACTION ON MOOTNESS GROUNDS AND TAKING STATUS CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 82; Status Conference (Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • DocketStipulation and Order; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER FOR:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • DocketResponse; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2015
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • DocketPetition; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • DocketVERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less