This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/01/2023 at 06:22:17 (UTC).

ZBIGNIEW JOZEF ADAMCZEWSKI VS JOE FLORES, JR.

Case Summary

On 08/15/2022 ZBIGNIEW JOZEF ADAMCZEWSKI filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOE FLORES, JR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5383

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADAMCZEWSKI ZBIGNIEW JOZEF

Defendant

FLORES JOE JR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS ALLEN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/15/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

8/15/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

8/15/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/15/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/15/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

8/15/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

8/15/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2025
  • Hearing08/18/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2024
  • Hearing02/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/18/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Zbigniew Jozef Adamczewski (Plaintiff); As to: JOE FLORES, JR. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Zbigniew Jozef Adamczewski (Plaintiff); As to: JOE FLORES, JR. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Zbigniew Jozef Adamczewski (Plaintiff); As to: JOE FLORES, JR. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less