This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/05/2022 at 05:15:48 (UTC).

ZBIGNIEW JOZEF ADAMCZEWSKI VS JAMES DOYLE

Case Summary

On 07/18/2022 ZBIGNIEW JOZEF ADAMCZEWSKI filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JAMES DOYLE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4739

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADAMCZEWSKI ZBIGNIEW JOZEF

Defendant

DOYLE JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS ALLEN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

7/18/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

7/18/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Complaint - Complaint

7/18/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/18/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

7/18/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/16/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketAddress for Allen Thomas (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/21/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Zbigniew Jozef Adamczewski on 07/18/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Zbigniew Jozef Adamczewski as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Zbigniew Jozef Adamczewski (Plaintiff); As to: James Doyle (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/21/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Zbigniew Jozef Adamczewski (Plaintiff); As to: James Doyle (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Zbigniew Jozef Adamczewski (Plaintiff); As to: James Doyle (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Zbigniew Jozef Adamczewski (Plaintiff); As to: James Doyle (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS ALLEN