This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/26/2021 at 14:06:09 (UTC).

Z & M, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS SUN ENERGY CONSTRUCTION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 Z M, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SUN ENERGY CONSTRUCTION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4503

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Z & M LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

SUN ENERGY CONSTRUCTION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BRENNICK STEPHEN M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEIDE RICHARD L. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

6/15/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/15/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/15/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2024
  • Hearing06/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • Hearing12/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Z & M, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: SUN ENERGY CONSTRUCTION, a California corporation (Defendant); STEPHEN M. BRENNICK (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Z & M, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: SUN ENERGY CONSTRUCTION, a California corporation (Defendant); STEPHEN M. BRENNICK (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Z & M, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: SUN ENERGY CONSTRUCTION, a California corporation (Defendant); STEPHEN M. BRENNICK (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seide, Richard L