This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/10/2022 at 15:11:11 (UTC).

XPO LOGISTICS INC. VS SPIKE LIGHTING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/17/2021 XPO LOGISTICS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SPIKE LIGHTING, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT R. HERIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1335

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT R. HERIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

XPO LOGISTICS INC.

Defendant

SPIKE LIGHTING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRODKIN ALAN

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

11/17/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/17/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

11/17/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Amended Summons

11/19/2021: Summons - Amended Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2022
  • Hearing11/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Summons on Complaint: Exact Name changed from Amended Summons to Amended Summons on Complaint; As To Parties changed from SPIKE LIGHTING, INC., a California corporation (Defendant) to SPIKE LIGHTING, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketAmended Summons; Issued and Filed by: XPO LOGISTICS INC. (Plaintiff); As to: SPIKE LIGHTING, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Scott R. Herin in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: XPO LOGISTICS INC. (Plaintiff); As to: SPIKE LIGHTING, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: XPO LOGISTICS INC. (Plaintiff); As to: SPIKE LIGHTING, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: XPO LOGISTICS INC. (Plaintiff); As to: SPIKE LIGHTING, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XPO Logistics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRODKIN ALAN