This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/27/2021 at 11:25:48 (UTC).

XISHUN MIAO VS JESUS RAMON LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 XISHUN MIAO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JESUS RAMON LOPEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1597

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIAO XISHUN

Defendant

LOPEZ JESUS RAMON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRAN QUANG VAN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/20/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Complaint - Complaint

2/24/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/24/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/24/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by XISHUN MIAO on 02/24/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by XISHUN MIAO as to JESUS RAMON LOPEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketAddress for Quang Van Tran (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: XISHUN MIAO (Plaintiff); As to: JESUS RAMON LOPEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: XISHUN MIAO (Plaintiff); As to: JESUS RAMON LOPEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: XISHUN MIAO (Plaintiff); As to: JESUS RAMON LOPEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: XISHUN MIAO (Plaintiff); As to: JESUS RAMON LOPEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRAN QUANG VAN