This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/11/2022 at 21:45:22 (UTC).

WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS OWNER TRUSTEE FOR UPGRADE MASTER PASS THRU TRUST VS ALBERTO VILLA

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS OWNER TRUSTEE FOR UPGRADE MASTER PASS THRU TRUST filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALBERTO VILLA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0101

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS OWNER TRUSTEE FOR UPGRADE MASTER PASS THRU TRUST

Defendant

VILLA ALBERTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

D'ANNA LAURA M.

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

1/6/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/6/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

1/6/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

1/6/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/6/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

1/6/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2025
  • Hearing01/09/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • Hearing07/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS OWNER TRUSTEE FOR UPGRADE MASTER PASS THRU TRUST (Plaintiff); As to: ALBERTO VILLA (Defendant); Service Cost: 89.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS OWNER TRUSTEE FOR UPGRADE MASTER PASS THRU TRUST (Plaintiff); As to: ALBERTO VILLA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS OWNER TRUSTEE FOR UPGRADE MASTER PASS THRU TRUST (Plaintiff); As to: ALBERTO VILLA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS OWNER TRUSTEE FOR UPGRADE MASTER PASS THRU TRUST (Plaintiff); As to: ALBERTO VILLA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/09/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VILLA ALBERT is a litigant

Latest cases where WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY, BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer D'ANNA LAURA M.