Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2021 at 08:10:23 (UTC).

WILLOW CREEK VILLAGE LANCASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS SHE BEVERAGE COMPANY, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 WILLOW CREEK VILLAGE LANCASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against SHE BEVERAGE COMPANY, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3004

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLOW CREEK VILLAGE LANCASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendant

SHE BEVERAGE COMPANY INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AKA SHE BEVERAGE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEDIONI DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/28/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/8/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint - Complaint

4/15/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/15/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/15/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketAddress for DANIEL MEDIONI (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by WILLOW CREEK VILLAGE LANCASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION on 04/15/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by WILLOW CREEK VILLAGE LANCASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: WILLOW CREEK VILLAGE LANCASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: SHE BEVERAGE COMPANY, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/07/2021; Service Cost: 155.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: WILLOW CREEK VILLAGE LANCASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: SHE BEVERAGE COMPANY, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: WILLOW CREEK VILLAGE LANCASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: SHE BEVERAGE COMPANY, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: WILLOW CREEK VILLAGE LANCASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: SHE BEVERAGE COMPANY, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILLOWCREEK VILLAGE LANCASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION DBA WILLOWCREEK HOA is a litigant

Latest cases where SHE BEVERAGE COMPANY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEDIONI DANIEL M