This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/14/2021 at 18:04:37 (UTC).

WILLIAMS HENRY MARTINEZ GUILLEN VS YENIFER RAMOS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/26/2021 WILLIAMS HENRY MARTINEZ GUILLEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against YENIFER RAMOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3239

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ GUILLEN WILLIAMS HENRY

Defendants

RAMOS YENIFER

MADRID ANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FU EUGENE S.

Defendant Attorney

BUI TATIANA YOKOYAMA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/26/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/26/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

4/26/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Answer - Answer

6/24/2021: Answer - Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/3/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/3/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2024
  • Hearing04/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • Hearing10/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: YENIFER RAMOS (Defendant); ANA MADRID (Defendant); As to: WILLIAMS HENRY MARTINEZ GUILLEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: WILLIAMS HENRY MARTINEZ GUILLEN (Plaintiff); As to: ANA MADRID (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/30/2021; Service Cost: 89.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: WILLIAMS HENRY MARTINEZ GUILLEN (Plaintiff); As to: YENIFER RAMOS (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/30/2021; Service Cost: 59.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: WILLIAMS HENRY MARTINEZ GUILLEN (Plaintiff); As to: YENIFER RAMOS (Defendant); ANA MADRID (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: WILLIAMS HENRY MARTINEZ GUILLEN (Plaintiff); As to: YENIFER RAMOS (Defendant); ANA MADRID (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: WILLIAMS HENRY MARTINEZ GUILLEN (Plaintiff); As to: YENIFER RAMOS (Defendant); ANA MADRID (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUI TATIANA YOKOYAMA