This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/03/2021 at 00:24:38 (UTC).

WHEELS FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC VS RONALD ALAN CLINE

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 WHEELS FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RONALD ALAN CLINE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY S. LESSER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0814

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GREGORY S. LESSER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHEELS FINANCIAL GROUP LLC DBA LOANMART

Defendant

CLINE RONALD ALAN AKA RONNIE A. CLINE AKA CLINE RON

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/9/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

9/1/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

9/1/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

9/1/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims]

9/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims]

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • Hearing11/02/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department S13 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Wheels Financial Group, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Ronald Alan Cline (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/03/2021; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name): As To Parties changed from Ronald Alan Cline (Defendant) to Ronald Alan Cline (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name); Filed by: Wheels Financial Group, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Ronald Alan Cline (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gregory S. Lesser in Department S13 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/02/2021 at 10:00 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name): As To Parties changed from Ronald Alan Cline (Defendant) to Ronald Alan Cline (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name): As To Parties changed from Ronald Alan Cline (Defendant) to Ronald Alan Cline (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name): As To Parties changed from Ronald Alan Cline (Defendant) to Ronald Alan Cline (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHEELS FINANCIAL GROUP LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DB is a litigant