This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2023 at 10:02:53 (UTC).

WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC VS ODRA MILLER

Case Summary

On 12/19/2022 WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ODRA MILLER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0213

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES

Defendant

MILLER ODRA AKA ODRA LANETTE MILLER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AFZALNIA AFSANEH

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Venue

12/19/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Venue

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/19/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/19/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/19/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

12/19/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non Service

1/31/2023: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

5/11/2023: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Westlake Services, LLC on 12/19/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Westlake Services, LLC as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Odra Miller (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Non Service; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lillian Vega Jacobs in Department Y Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Odra Miller (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Odra Miller (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Re: Venue; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Odra Miller (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Odra Miller (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less