This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2023 at 14:25:18 (UTC).

WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC VS MARC BERTHOUMIEUX

Case Summary

On 02/28/2023 WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MARC BERTHOUMIEUX. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1402

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

BERTHOUMIEUX MARC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN JOSHUA P

 

Court Documents

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

2/28/2023: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

2/28/2023: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

2/28/2023: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/28/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

2/28/2023: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/28/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/28/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

4/14/2023: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2026
  • Hearing03/03/2026 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2024
  • Hearing08/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Marc Berthoumieux (Defendant); Service Date: 03/30/2023; Service Cost: 200.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Marc Berthoumieux (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Marc Berthoumieux (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Marc Berthoumieux (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/03/2026 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less