This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/25/2021 at 08:14:48 (UTC).

WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS HMA FAMILY LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HMA FAMILY LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4860

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES

Defendants

HMA FAMILY LLC DBA K TOWN AUTO

KHAN MOHAMMAD AKA MOHAMMAD K KHAN AKA MOHAMMAD KHURSHID KHAN AKA MOHAMMAD KHURSHID AKA MOHAMMAD KHURSHID UHEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FREED KENNETH J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

7/1/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/1/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

7/1/2021: Complaint - Complaint

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

7/1/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

7/1/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2024
  • Hearing07/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • Hearing12/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: HMA Family LLC (Defendant); Mohammad Khan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: HMA Family LLC (Defendant); Mohammad Khan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: HMA Family LLC (Defendant); Mohammad Khan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FREED KENNETH JAY