This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/01/2021 at 11:05:11 (UTC).

WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS GLOBAL AUTO BODY & COLLISION INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GLOBAL AUTO BODY COLLISION INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7356

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES

Defendants

GLOBAL AUTO BODY & COLLISION INC AKA GLOBAL AUTO LOGISTICS LLC AKA GLOBAL AUTO SALES & LOGISTICS

SILMI RANIA S. AKA RANIA E. SILMI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEEKS DAVID EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

10/12/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

10/12/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Complaint - Complaint

10/12/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/12/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

10/12/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

11/22/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

11/22/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF JOSEPH JYOO RE SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT VIA CERTIFIED MAIL

11/22/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF JOSEPH JYOO RE SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT VIA CERTIFIED MAIL

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF JOSEPH JYOO RE SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT VIA CERTIFIED MAIL

11/22/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF JOSEPH JYOO RE SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT VIA CERTIFIED MAIL

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2024
  • Hearing10/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • Hearing04/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration OF JOSEPH JYOO RE SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT VIA CERTIFIED MAIL; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Rania S. Silmi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration OF JOSEPH JYOO RE SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT VIA CERTIFIED MAIL; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Global Auto Body & Collision Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Global Auto Body & Collision Inc (Defendant); Rania S. Silmi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Global Auto Body & Collision Inc (Defendant); Rania S. Silmi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Global Auto Body & Collision Inc (Defendant); Rania S. Silmi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEEKS DAVID