This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/18/2022 at 14:00:02 (UTC).

WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS FLAGSHIP AUTO LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FLAGSHIP AUTO LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7358

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES

Defendants

FLAGSHIP AUTO LLC

SPIRITI ANTHONY AKA ANTHONY M SPIRITI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEEKS DAVID EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

10/12/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

10/12/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

10/12/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

10/12/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/12/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

11/15/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

11/15/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/29/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2024
  • Hearing10/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • Hearing04/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Flagship Auto LLC (Defendant); Anthony Spiriti (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to Flagship Auto LLC; Anthony Spiriti; On the Complaint filed by Westlake Services, LLC, a California limited liability company on 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Flagship Auto LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Anthony Spiriti (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Flagship Auto LLC (Defendant); Anthony Spiriti (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Flagship Auto LLC (Defendant); Anthony Spiriti (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Flagship Auto LLC (Defendant); Anthony Spiriti (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEEKS DAVID