This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2023 at 16:12:32 (UTC).

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, A SOUTH DAKOTA CORPORATION VS DEVRIM WELLMAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/22/2023 WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, A SOUTH DAKOTA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DEVRIM WELLMAN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1298

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY A SOUTH DAKOTA CORPORATION

Defendants

WELLMAN DEVRIM

TORRES LISA ANDREA

ORION CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE BIBIANA S.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

2/22/2023: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/22/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

2/22/2023: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/22/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

2/22/2023: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

2/22/2023: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/22/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

3/28/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Answer - Answer

4/7/2023: Answer - Answer

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/18/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2026
  • Hearing02/25/2026 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2024
  • Hearing08/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Western Surety Company, a South Dakota corporation (Plaintiff); As to: DEVRIM WELLMAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: LISA ANDREA TORRES (Defendant); As to: Western Surety Company, a South Dakota corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Western Surety Company, a South Dakota corporation (Plaintiff); As to: LISA ANDREA TORRES (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/25/2026 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Western Surety Company, a South Dakota corporation (Plaintiff); As to: DEVRIM WELLMAN (Defendant); LISA ANDREA TORRES (Defendant); ORION CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Western Surety Company, a South Dakota corporation (Plaintiff); As to: DEVRIM WELLMAN (Defendant); LISA ANDREA TORRES (Defendant); ORION CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Western Surety Company, a South Dakota corporation (Plaintiff); As to: DEVRIM WELLMAN (Defendant); LISA ANDREA TORRES (Defendant); ORION CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less