This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2023 at 16:16:39 (UTC).

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION VS RICHARD NOYER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/02/2023 WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RICHARD NOYER,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1469

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY A CORPORATION

Defendants

KINCAID DAVID

KRUSE JENNIFER

NEWCOMB JULIA

HUH YOUNG

SHARAD SHRESTHA

BLAIR ROBERT

DUH WILLIAM

STREETER CRISTIAN

KENT SEAN D.

KENT LUCINDA

HATTARKI REBECCA

OUK SEAN

NAVARRO MARLEEN

GSTOTTENMAYR PETER

OWEN JAMES

MADADI MARJAN

GIAMARTINO TERRI

BURGESS JOCELYN

NGUYEN THANH

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOSA CARLOS

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/23/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

5/23/2023: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/23/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/23/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/23/2023: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/23/2023: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/23/2023: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/23/2023: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/23/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/23/2023: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/23/2023: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/23/2023: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/23/2023: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/23/2023: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/10/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/10/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/2/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

3/2/2023: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2026
  • Hearing03/05/2026 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2024
  • Hearing08/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Western Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Robert Blair (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/03/2023; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint in Interpleader filed by Western Surety Company, a corporation on 03/02/2023, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Western Surety Company, a corporation as to Cristian Streeter and Marjan Madadi

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Western Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Cristian Streeter (Defendant); Marjan Madadi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Western Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Rebecca Hattarki (Defendant); Service Date: 05/05/2023; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Western Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: James Owen (Defendant); Service Date: 05/05/2023; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Western Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Lucinda Kent (Defendant); Service Date: 05/10/2023; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Western Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Peter Gstottenmayr (Defendant); Service Date: 05/04/2023; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Western Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Sean Ouk (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/08/2023; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketComplaint in Interpleader; Filed by: Western Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Richard Noyer (Defendant); Todd Chapman (Defendant); Lorelie Matsuda (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Western Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Richard Noyer (Defendant); Todd Chapman (Defendant); Lorelie Matsuda (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Western Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Richard Noyer (Defendant); Todd Chapman (Defendant); Lorelie Matsuda (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/05/2026 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less