This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2022 at 21:24:10 (UTC).

WEST COVINA MOTOR GROUP LLC VS ROBIN SAUL LOPEZ ORTIZ

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 WEST COVINA MOTOR GROUP LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROBIN SAUL LOPEZ ORTIZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH M. FULLER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0949

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENNETH M. FULLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEST COVINA MOTOR GROUP LLC

Defendant

LOPEZ ORTIZ ROBIN SAUL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

7/30/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/30/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

7/30/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/3/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

9/20/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/17/2021

9/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/17/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

9/17/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

9/17/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Orange)

12/14/2021: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Orange)

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

12/13/2021: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ - Return - Writ - Return (Orange - Unsatisfied)

6/16/2022: Writ - Return - Writ - Return (Orange - Unsatisfied)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Orange): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 06/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketWrit - Return (Orange - Unsatisfied) ( Unsatisfied); West Covina Motor Group LLC (Plaintiff); Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Orange); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: West Covina Motor Group LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Robin Saul Lopez Ortiz (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 58.08; Credits: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/17/2021 at 01:30 PM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 3 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/17/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: West Covina Motor Group LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff West Covina Motor Group LLC against Defendant Robin Saul Lopez Ortiz on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by West Covina Motor Group LLC on 07/30/2021 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $150.00 for a total of $2,650.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: West Covina Motor Group LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Robin Saul Lopez Ortiz (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/18/21; Service Cost: 100.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Robin Saul Lopez Ortiz (Defendant) to Robin Saul Lopez Ortiz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/17/2021 at 01:30 PM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: West Covina Motor Group LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Robin Saul Lopez Ortiz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kenneth M. Fuller in Department 3 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST COVINA MOTOR GROUP LLC DBA WEST COVINA NISSAN is a litigant